Riley v. Union Pacific Railroad Company

Plaintiff: Robert M. Riley, Jr.
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
 
Case Number: 6:2009cv00155
Filed: April 20, 2009
 
Court: Oklahoma Eastern District Court
Office: Muskogee Office
County: Muskogee
Referring Judge: Steven P. Shreder
Presiding Judge: Kimberly E. West
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 45:51 Railways: Fed. Employer's Liability Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 11, 2010 86 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Mag. Judge Kimberly E. West granting in part and denying in part 55 Defendant's Daubert Motion Regarding William O. Hopkins, M.D. (neh, Deputy Clerk)
May 12, 2010 87 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Mag. Judge Kimberly E. West denying 34 Motion for Summary Judgment. (sjw, Chambers)
May 13, 2010 89 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION & ORDER by Mag. Judge Kimberly E. West granting in part and denying in part 54 Motion in Limine (sjw, Chambers)
May 14, 2010 93 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION & ORDER by Mag. Judge Kimberly E. West: granting 56 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 57 Motion in Limine; denying 58 Motion in Limine; granting 59 Motion in Limine; granting 71 Motion in Limine. (sjw, Chambers)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Riley v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert M. Riley, Jr.
Represented By: C. Bart Fite
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]