Agape Flights, Inc. v. Covington Aircraft Engines, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Agape Flights, Inc.
Defendant: Covington Aircraft Engines, Inc., Pratt & Whitney Canada Corporation, Hamilton Sundstrand Corporation and John Doe
Case Number: 6:2009cv00492
Filed: December 21, 2009
Court: Oklahoma Eastern District Court
Office: Muskogee Office
County: Okmulgee
Presiding Judge: Frank H. Seay
Nature of Suit: Airplane Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 7, 2010 122 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION & ORDER by Judge Frank H. Seay denying 90 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (trl, Chambers)
January 12, 2011 187 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Frank H. Seay granting 88 Banyan's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (dma, Deputy Clerk)
June 28, 2011 208 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Frank H. Seay granting 127 Motion for Summary Judgment. ; granting 128 Motion for Summary Judgment as to all claims asserted by Agape against defts., Pratt & Whitney Canada and Sundstrand and said claims are dismissed (trl, Chambers)
September 27, 2011 217 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Frank H. Seay granting 214 Motion to Dismiss Agape's negligence claim only against Kansas Aviation (trl, Chambers)
July 9, 2012 259 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Frank H. Seay granting 248 Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendant Covington is in all respects, dismissed from this action(trl, Chambers)
October 26, 2012 287 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Frank H. Seay granting 253 Motion for Summary Judgment ; denying 269 Motion to Reconsider (trl, Chambers)
October 26, 2012 288 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT by Judge Frank H. Seay entering judgment in favor of Banyan Air Service, Inc., Covington Aircraft Engines, Inc., Hamilton Sundstrand Corporation, Kansas Aviation of Independence, LLC, Pratt & Whitney Canada Corporation against Agape Flights, Inc. (case terminated), dismissing/terminating case (case terminated) (trl, Chambers)
February 19, 2013 322 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Frank H. Seay granting 298 Motion for Attorney Fees(trl, Chambers)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Agape Flights, Inc. v. Covington Aircraft Engines, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Agape Flights, Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence R. Murphy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Covington Aircraft Engines, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pratt & Whitney Canada Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamilton Sundstrand Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]