Green v. Hargis et al

Plaintiff: Jerry Dale Green
Defendant: Joel Mark Hargis and Western Express, Inc.
 
Case Number: 6:2010cv00415
Filed: November 5, 2010
 
Court: Oklahoma Eastern District Court
Office: Muskogee Office
County: Muskogee
Presiding Judge: Kimberly E. West
 
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 22, 2012 70 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER by Mag. Judge Kimberly E. West : GRANTING 64 Motion to Withdraw Attorney Phil Votaw as counsel of record for plaintiff; remaining deadlines, including pretrial conference and jury trial as set in Minute Orders of 10/7/2011 and 10/ 28/2011 are STRICKEN; Deft allowed until 3/28/2012 to file motion to dismiss, response due 4/6/2012, and reply due 4/11/2012; Hearing on Motion to Dismiss will be conducted on 4/16/2012 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 3, Room 432, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Mag. Judge Kimberly E. West. 64 (neh, Deputy Clerk)
June 25, 2012 77 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West denying defendants' motion to dismiss ( 72 MOTION to Dismiss ) and sanctioning plaintiff, directing plaintiff to respond to certain pending motions by 8/24/12 ((Re: 61 MOTION DEFENDANTS DAUBERT MOTI ON TO EXCLUDE DR. ARTHUR CONLEY, 62 MOTION DEFENDANTS DAUBERT MOTION TO EXCLUDE DR. RALPH SCOTT, 63 MOTION in Limine ) and setting scheduling dates to include the following: Jury Instructions, Voir Dire & Trial Briefs due by 9/20/2012; Proposed P retrial Order due by 9/20/2012; Pretrial Conference set for 9/27/2012 at 09:45 AM in Chambers, Room 430, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West; and Jury Trial set for 10/15/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2, Room 224, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West.(law, Deputy Clerk)
October 19, 2012 99 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West granting 97 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss. Deadlines stricken. (case terminated) (neh, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Green v. Hargis et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Dale Green
Represented By: Phil Votaw
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Mark Hargis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Express, Inc.
Represented By: Robert P. Coffey, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]