Womack v. Jones et al

Respondent: Justin Jones and Attorney General of the State of Oklahoma
Petitioner: Bryan Dean Womack
Case Number: 6:2012cv00399
Filed: September 24, 2012
Court: Oklahoma Eastern District Court
Office: Muskogee Office
County: Love
Referring Judge: Kimberly E. West
Presiding Judge: Frank H. Seay
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 7, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West, directing Respondent to show cause why the writ should not issue and file a response to the petition.(Responses due by 12/7/2012)(sjw, Chambers)
June 14, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Frank H. Seay : Granting 13 respondent's Motion to Dismiss. (acg, Deputy Clerk)
June 14, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Frank H. Seay, denying certificate of appealability(acg, Deputy Clerk)
June 24, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Frank H. Seay, denying certificate of appealability(acg, Deputy Clerk)
September 24, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 5 Report and Recommendation. Case transferred to the U.S. District Court, Eastern District of Oklahoma. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 9/24/2012. (mb) [Transferred from okwd on 9/25/2012.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Womack v. Jones et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Justin Jones
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Oklahoma
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Bryan Dean Womack
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]