Occidental Hoteles Management, S.L. v. Hargrave Arts, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Occidental Hoteles Management, S.L.
Defendant: Hargrave Arts, LLC and Carter Hargrave
 
Case Number: 4:2009cv00526
Filed: August 17, 2009
 
Court: Oklahoma Northern District Court
Office: Tulsa Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Paul J Cleary
Presiding Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 24, 2009 40 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 7/24/2009.(vcf, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 8/18/2009.]
April 6, 2010 70 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; granting in part and denying in part 57 Motion to Dismiss (hbo, Dpty Clk)
April 8, 2010 71 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; granting in part and denying in part 58 Motion to Strike (hbo, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Occidental Hoteles Management, S.L. v. Hargrave Arts, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Occidental Hoteles Management, S.L.
Represented By: William J. Cremer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hargrave Arts, LLC
Represented By: Robin Becker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carter Hargrave
Represented By: Robin Becker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]