Southcrest, L.L.C. v. Bovis Lend Lease, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Southcrest, L.L.C.
Defendant: Bovis Lend Lease, Inc., Gould Turner Group, P.C. and Carlisle Syntec, Inc.
 
Case Number: 4:2010cv00362
Filed: June 4, 2010
 
Court: Oklahoma Northern District Court
Office: Tulsa Office
County: Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
 
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 11, 2011 174 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Judge Claire V Eagan ; granting in part and finding as moot in part 106 Motion for Leave to File Document(s); granting in part and finding as moot in part 107 Motion to Amend; granting 157 Motion for Leave to File Doc ument(s); granting 159 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s); granting 167 Joinder in Motion; granting 169 Joinder in Motion; granting 171 Joinder in Motion (Re: 2 Complaint, 90 Third Party Complaint, ) (RGG, Chambers)
May 27, 2011 197 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy ; granting in part and denying in part 87 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 88 Motion to Compel (jcm, Dpty Clk)
May 27, 2011 198 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy ; granting in part and denying in part 143 Motion to Compel (jcm, Dpty Clk)
September 2, 2011 217 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Judge Claire V Eagan ; granting in part and denying in part 201 Motion to Dismiss; denying 211 Motion for Default Judgment (Re: 190 Amended Complaint, 184 Amended Third Party Complaint, 182 Third Party Complaint ) (RGG, Chambers)
October 6, 2011 229 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Judge Claire V Eagan ; denying 215 Motion for Summary Judgment (Re: 184 Amended Third Party Complaint, 90 Third Party Complaint, ) (RGG, Chambers)
December 12, 2011 270 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Judge Claire V Eagan ; terminating party Carlisle Syntec, Inc. ; granting 251 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Documents Terminated: 251 MOTION for Finding of Good Faith Settlement ) (djh, Dpty Clk)
July 19, 2012 464 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan that the Motion for Finding of Good Faith Settlement (Dkt. # 455) is granted. Apax will not be subject to any contribution or indemnification claims by an alleged joint tortfeasor. ; granting 455 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Re: 426 Stipulation of Dismissal ) (RGG, Chambers)
August 6, 2012 497 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan that the Motion for Finding of Good Faith Settlement (Dkt. # 473) is granted. Supreme will not be subject to any contribution or indemnification claims by an alleged joint tortfeasor. ; granting 473 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (RGG, Chambers)
August 20, 2012 515 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan that the Motion for Finding of Good Faith Settlement (Dkt. # 500) is granted. Bovis is discharged from all liability for contribution from any alleged joint tortfeasor. ; granting 500 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (RGG, Chambers)
August 20, 2012 518 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy ; granting in part and denying in part 496 Motion to Strike Document(s) (jcm, Dpty Clk)
August 29, 2012 524 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan ; denying 516 Motion to Substitute Party (RGG, Chambers)
August 30, 2012 527 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan that Fourth Party Defendant Southern Plastering, Inc.'s Motion for Relief from Order and Brief in Support (Dkt. # 508) is granted and that Southern Plastering's motion for summary judgment (Dkt. # 429) is reinstated. Southern Plastering's motion for summary judgment (Dkt. # 429) is denied. ; granting 508 Motion for Relief (Re: 429 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Brief in Support ) (RGG, Chambers)
September 6, 2012 535 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan that the Motion for Finding of Good Faith Settlement (Dkt. # 528) is granted. Delta is discharged from all liability for contribution from any alleged joint tortfeasor. ; granting 528 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (RGG, Chambers)
September 6, 2012 536 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan that the Joint Motion for Finding of Good Faith Settlement (Dkt. # 525) is granted. ABG is discharged from all liability for contribution from any alleged joint tortfeasor. ; granting 525 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (RGG, Chambers)
September 28, 2010 61 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy (Re: 44 Opposed MOTION Establish Protocols for Preservation of Evidence ) (jcm, Dpty Clk)
October 14, 2010 63 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Judge Claire V Eagan ; granting 28 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot 30 Motion for More Definite Statement; granting 31 Joinder in Motion (Re: 2 Complaint ) (RGG, Chambers)
February 7, 2011 77 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Judge Claire V Eagan that Gould and Bovis are entitled to judgment on Southcrest's negligence claims based on the construction of the original hospital ; granting 64 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; granting 65 Joinder in Motion (Re: 2 Complaint ) (RGG, Chambers)
March 16, 2011 89 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Judge Claire V Eagan that the Motion for Leave to File Third-Party Complaint (Dkt. # 82) is granted. Defendant shall file its third-party complaint forthwith. ; granting 82 Motion for Leave to File Document(s) (Re: 2 Complaint ) (RGG, Chambers)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Southcrest, L.L.C. v. Bovis Lend Lease, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southcrest, L.L.C.
Represented By: David Ryan Cordell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bovis Lend Lease, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gould Turner Group, P.C.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlisle Syntec, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]