Securities and Exchange Commission v. Fox

Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Brian D Fox
 
Case Number: 4:2011cv00211
Filed: April 8, 2011
 
Court: Oklahoma Northern District Court
Office: Tulsa Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Paul J Cleary
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
 
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 22, 2011 22 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Judge Claire V Eagan that Plaintiff's Motion for Final Judgment by Default against Defendant Brian D. Fox with Supporting Brief (Dkt. # 18) is denied. The order (Dkt. # 16) granting plaintiff's motion for entry of default is vacated, and plaintiff's motion for entry of default (Dkt. # 15) is denied. Defendant's answer to the amended complaint (Dkt. # 9) is due no later than November 29, 2011. Failure to file an answer to the amended complaint may result in sanctions, including entry of default. The parties are also advised that the settlement conference remains set for January 19, 2012. ; vacating/setting aside order(s); denying 18 Motion for Default Judgment (Re : 16 Order,, Ruling on Motion for Entry of Default by Clerk,,, 15 MOTION for Entry of Default by Clerk against Brian D. Fox Application for Clerk's Entry of Default As to Defendant Brian D. Fox, 9 Amended Complaint ) (Documents Terminated: 16 Order,, Ruling on Motion for Entry of Default by Clerk,,, ) (RGG, Chambers)
November 2, 2012 52 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan ; granting 40 Motion for Judgment; granting 44 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (djh, Dpty Clk)
January 2, 2013 57 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan ; denying 54 Motion to Reconsider; denying 54 Motion to Vacate Order/Judgment; denying 54 Motion for New Trial (Re: 52 Opinion and Order, Ruling on Motion for Judgment, Ruling on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, 53 Judgment, ) (RGG, Chambers)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Fox
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Jeffrey A Cohen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian D Fox
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]