McDonald v. Glanz et al

Plaintiff: Tara L McDonald
Defendant: Stanley Glanz and Board of County Commissioners of Tulsa County
 
Case Number: 4:2012cv00374
Filed: July 5, 2012
 
Court: Oklahoma Northern District Court
Office: Tulsa Office
County: Tulsa
Referring Judge: Paul J Cleary
Presiding Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
 
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 10, 2013 11 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 1/21/2013); granting 8 Motion to Dismiss (hbo, Dpty Clk)
March 1, 2013 18 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell , setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Responses due by 3/11/2013, Replies due by 3/25/2013) (Re: 14 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Drop Party and Brief in Support ) (hbo, Dpty Clk)
June 27, 2013 21 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 7/8/2013); granting 13 Motion to Dismiss (hbo, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: McDonald v. Glanz et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara L McDonald
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Represented By: Miranda Rachelle Russell
Represented By: Lauren Grace Lambright
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Glanz
Represented By: Douglas Allen Wilson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of County Commissioners of Tulsa County
Represented By: Douglas Allen Wilson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]