H.S. Field Services, Inc. v. CEP Mid-Continent, LLC

Counter_claimant: CEP Mid-Continent, LLC
Counter_defendant: H.S. Field Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: H.S. Field Services, Inc.
Defendant: CEP Mid-Continent, LLC
 
Case Number: 4:2012cv00531
Filed: September 21, 2012
 
Court: Oklahoma Northern District Court
Office: Tulsa Office
County: Washington
Referring Judge: Paul J Cleary
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 9, 2014 130 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Paul J Cleary ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 7/21/2014); denying 93 Motion to Recuse (kjp, Dpty Clk)
September 25, 2013 48 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER by Judge John E Dowdell Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendant's Affirmative Defenses (Doc. 16) is denied. ; denying 16 Motion to Strike (Re: 14 Answer ) (SAS, Chambers)
March 18, 2014 74 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Paul J Cleary ; granting in part and denying in part 53 Motion to Compel; denying 61 Motion for Sanctions (kjp, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: H.S. Field Services, Inc. v. CEP Mid-Continent, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: CEP Mid-Continent, LLC
Represented By: Heather Leanne Cupp
Represented By: James C T Hardwick
Represented By: J Kevin Hayes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: H.S. Field Services, Inc.
Represented By: Johnny P Akers
Represented By: Frederick Scott Esser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H.S. Field Services, Inc.
Represented By: Frederick Scott Esser
Represented By: Johnny P Akers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CEP Mid-Continent, LLC
Represented By: James C T Hardwick
Represented By: Heather Leanne Cupp
Represented By: J Kevin Hayes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]