Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Unit Drilling Company et al

Defendant: Unit Corporation and Unit Drilling Company
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Intervenor_plaintiff: Patsy Anne Craig
Case Number: 4:2013cv00147
Filed: March 13, 2013
Court: Oklahoma Northern District Court
Office: Tulsa Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Paul J Cleary
Presiding Judge: Terence Kern
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 28, 2014 117 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Terence Kern (Re: 103 MOTION to Strike Document(s) MOTION to Expedite Ruling ) (vah, Chambers)
July 17, 2014 167 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Paul J Cleary ; granting 149 Motion to Compel (kjp, Dpty Clk)
July 21, 2014 169 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Paul J Cleary ; granting in part and denying in part 148 Motion to Compel (kjp, Dpty Clk)
September 2, 2014 209 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Paul J Cleary ; granting 183 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (kjp, Dpty Clk)
November 1, 2013 76 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Terence Kern ; denying 53 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot 68 Objection to Magistrate Judge's Order; finding as moot 71 Motion to Stay (vah, Chambers)
January 13, 2014 96 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Paul J Cleary ; granting 84 Motion to Quash; finding as moot 85 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief; finding as moot 85 Motion for Protective Order (kjp, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Unit Drilling Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unit Corporation
Represented By: Christopher J. DeGroff
Represented By: J Daniel Morgan
Represented By: William Kirk Turner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unit Drilling Company
Represented By: William Kirk Turner
Represented By: J Daniel Morgan
Represented By: Christopher J. DeGroff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Jeannette F Swent
Represented By: Patrick JoHugh Holman
Represented By: Nancy Eileen Griffiths
Represented By: James Driscoll-MacEachron
Represented By: Andrea G Baran
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Patsy Anne Craig
Represented By: Dale M Dorius
Represented By: Jennifer D Reyes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]