Hill v. Truelove et al

Defendant: Sergeant Streabor, Sergeant Sanchez, Officer Truelove, John Doe and Officer Russell
Plaintiff: James Lynn Hill
 
Case Number: 5:2007cv00404
Filed: April 5, 2007
 
Court: Oklahoma Western District Court
Office: Oklahoma City Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Valerie K. Couch
Presiding Judge: Vicki Miles-LaGrange
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 16, 2009 131 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that the 98 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Sergeant Streabor, Sergeant Sanchez, Officer Truelove, Officer Russell be denied. Objections to R&R due by 10/6/2009. This R&R terminates the referral by the District Judge in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie K. Couch on 9/16/09. (ch, )
November 13, 2009 140 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 131 and denying 98 defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (as more fully set out in the Order) Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 11/13/2009. (ks)
January 6, 2010 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 135 plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default & Default Judgment and ordering defendants to file their answers in this case on or before 1/27/2010 (as more fully set out in the Order). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 1/6/2010. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hill v. Truelove et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Streabor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Sanchez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Truelove
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Russell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Lynn Hill
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]