Apache Tribe of Oklahoma v. Brown et al

Plaintiff: Apache Tribe of Oklahoma
Defendant: Betsy Ann Brown, Foshee & Yaffe Law Firm, Brown & Cullimore Law Office, John H Graves, Yancy Redcorn, Alonzo Chalepah, Mary Rivera and Wells Fargo National Bank
Case Number: 5:2010cv00646
Filed: June 22, 2010
Court: Oklahoma Western District Court
Office: Oklahoma City Office
County: Caddo
Presiding Judge: Timothy D. DeGiusti
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 8, 2012 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 104 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot 105 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot 106 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 6/8/2012. (mb)
August 14, 2013 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 111 Motion to Dismiss; granting 112 Motion to Dismiss; granting 113 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 8/14/2013. (mb)
August 4, 2010 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Striking re 12 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Apache Tribe of Oklahoma. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 8/4/2010. (mb, )
February 22, 2011 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 52 Motion to Dismiss; denying 53 Motion to Dismiss; granting 54 Motion to Stay Case; granting 55 Motion to Stay Case; denying 56 Motion to Dismiss; granting 57 Motion to Stay Case; denying 60 Motion to Dismiss; granting 61 Motion to Stay Case. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 2/22/2011. (mb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Apache Tribe of Oklahoma v. Brown et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Apache Tribe of Oklahoma
Represented By: Jon E Brightmire
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betsy Ann Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foshee & Yaffe Law Firm
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown & Cullimore Law Office
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John H Graves
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yancy Redcorn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alonzo Chalepah
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Rivera
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo National Bank
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]