Public Service Company of Oklahoma v. A Plus Inc et al

Plaintiff: Public Service Company of Oklahoma
Defendant: A Plus Inc, Randel R Stone and Kimberly A Stone
 
Case Number: 5:2010cv00651
Filed: June 24, 2010
 
Court: Oklahoma Western District Court
Office: Oklahoma City Office
County: Tulsa
Presiding Judge: Timothy D. DeGiusti
 
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 2, 2011 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 55 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot 75 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 8/2/2011. (mb, )
November 19, 2010 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing the parties to submit the file for in camera review re 23 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Randel R Stone, A Plus Inc, Kimberly A Stone. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 11/19/2010. (mb, )
February 16, 2011 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 33 Motion to Quash. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 2/16/2011. (mb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Public Service Company of Oklahoma v. A Plus Inc et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Public Service Company of Oklahoma
Represented By: Jon E Brightmire
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Plus Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randel R Stone
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly A Stone
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]