Agrawal v. Lahood

Plaintiff: Vimala Agrawal
Defendant: Raymond H Lahood
 
Case Number: 5:2011cv00164
Filed: February 17, 2011
 
Court: Oklahoma Western District Court
Office: Oklahoma City Office
County: Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Vicki Miles-LaGrange
 
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 3, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 10 defendant's Motion to Dismiss as follows: (A) The Court grants the motion to dismiss as to any claims in addition to those seven discrete promotions which were accepted for investigation by the EEO C and fully exhausted through that process, and (B) The Court denies the motion to dismiss in all other respects. Additionally, the Court directs plaintiff to serve the United States Attorney for the Western District of Oklahoma by November 15, 2011 (as more fully set out in order). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 11/3/2011. (ks)
June 25, 2012 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 27 plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Discovery, granting 26 defendant's Motion to Compel Responses to Discovery, and ordering plaintiff to respond to defendant's interrogatories and requests for p roduction by June 29, 2012. Additionally, the Court sanctions plaintiff's counsel for his conduct in relation to this discovery matter and orders him to pay for the reasonable expenses incurred by defendant, including attorney's fees, in preparing the motion (as more fully set out in order). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 6/25/2012. (ks)
September 25, 2012 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 55 defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment in Employment Discrimination Case (as more fully set out in order). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 9/25/2012. (ks)
March 13, 2013 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 92 plaintiff's Motion for New Trial (as more fully set out in order). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 3/13/2013. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Agrawal v. Lahood
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vimala Agrawal
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond H Lahood
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]