North American Insurance Agency Inc et al v. Bates

Defendant: Robert C Bates
Plaintiff: North American Insurance Agency Inc and Robert C Bates LLC
 
Case Number: 5:2012cv00544
Filed: May 14, 2012
 
Court: Oklahoma Western District Court
Office: Oklahoma City Office
County: Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Vicki Miles-LaGrange
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 25, 2013 107 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 100 plaintiffs' motion for leave to add additional parties and claims as follows: (A) The Court grants plaintiffs leave to add claims for unjust enrichment and civil conspiracy and to add Walt Pettit, Kim Buker, W. Sam Pettit, Debbie Morris, Walt Pettit CPCU, Inc., and Commercial Brokerage Services, Inc. as defendants in this action, and (B) The Court denites plaintiffs leave to add Bruce Barton, Tom Brown, William Gattis, F. Nicholas Karlovich, Robert Karlovich, Ralph Phillips, John Wheeler, Bradley McCrory, Brad Barton, Deardorff & Associates, Inc., and William R. Gattis Agency, L.L.C. as defendants in this action (as more fully set out in order). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 6/25/2013. (ks)
August 27, 2013 134 Featured Case ORDER denying 123 Bates and CIB's Renewed Motion to Quash Subpoenas Duces Tecum (as more fully set out in order). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 8/27/2013. (ks)
November 22, 2013 140 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 125 defendants Robert C. Bates, Commercial Insurance Brokers, LLC, Walt Pettit, Kim Buker, W. Sam Pettit, Debbie Morris, Walt Pettit CPCU, Inc., and Commercial Brokerage Services, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint (as more fully set out in order). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 11/22/2013. (ks)
June 15, 2012 22 Featured Case ORDER denying 19 defendant's Motion to Dismiss (as more fully set out in order). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 6/15/2012. (ks)
July 30, 2012 47 Featured Case ORDER denying 31 defendant Robert C. Bates' Motion to Stay (as more fully set out in order). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 7/30/2012. (njr)
August 23, 2012 79 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 62 plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction and ordering defendants to return to plaintiffs all electronic documents taken from plaintiffs' servers, computers or other devices and to return to plaintiffs the hard copy files that they have taken. Defendants, however, may retain a copy of any of these electronic documents that relate to their customers and a copy of any hard copy files that relate to their customers (as more fully set out in order). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 8/23/2012. (ks)
January 3, 2013 93 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 82 defendant Joey D. Dills Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) and for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(1) and Alternatively Motion for More D efinite Statement Pursuant to FRCP 12(c) as follows: The Court grants the motion to dismiss as to Count V (Violation of Computer Fraud and Abuse Act as Against All Defendants) of plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, dismisses Count V as to Dills, and denies the motion in all other respects (as more fully set out in order). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 1/3/2013. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: North American Insurance Agency Inc et al v. Bates
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert C Bates
Represented By: Catherine L Campbell
Represented By: Edward J Main
Represented By: William J Pickard
Represented By: James K Secrest, II
Represented By: Thomas G Wolfe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North American Insurance Agency Inc
Represented By: Patrick M Ryan
Represented By: Matthew C Kane
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert C Bates LLC
Represented By: Matthew C Kane
Represented By: Patrick M Ryan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]