Louisiana Municipal Police Employees Retirement System v. Continental Resources Inc et al

Defendant: Wheatland Oil Inc, Jeffrey B Hume, Robert J Grant, Continental Resources Inc, Harold G Hamm, H R Sanders, JR, John T McNabb, II, Mark E Monroe and Ellis McCain
Plaintiff: Louisiana Municipal Police Employees Retirement System
 
Case Number: 5:2012cv00667
Filed: June 12, 2012
 
Court: Oklahoma Western District Court
Office: Oklahoma City Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Robin J. Cauthron
 
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 3, 2012 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 11 Motion for TRO. Hearing 51 Motion for Preliminary Injunction set for 8/8/2012 at 10:00 a.m. Response briefs due no later than 12:00 p.m. No reply brief will be allowed. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 8/3/2012. (mb)
August 3, 2012 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 52 Motion for Discovery. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 8/3/2012. (mb)
August 9, 2012 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 51 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 70 Motion to Strike. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 8/9/2012. (mb)
May 16, 2013 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 86 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 5/16/2013. (mb)
May 30, 2013 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 87 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 5/30/2013. (mb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Louisiana Municipal Police Employees Retirement System v. Continental Resources Inc et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wheatland Oil Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey B Hume
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J Grant
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Resources Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold G Hamm
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H R Sanders, JR
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John T McNabb, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark E Monroe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellis McCain
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louisiana Municipal Police Employees Retirement System
Represented By: John E Barbush
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]