Rayner v. Union Pacific Railroad Company et al

Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company and Newfield Exploration Mid-Continent Inc
Plaintiff: Mitzi Jayne Rayner
Case Number: 5:2013cv00046
Filed: January 11, 2013
Court: Oklahoma Western District Court
Office: Oklahoma City Office
County: Custer
Presiding Judge: Vicki Miles-LaGrange
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 17, 2014 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 110 defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company's Motion to Quash Plaintiff's Subpoena of Harding Rome and for Protective Order and quashing plaintiff's subpoena of Harding Rome. Further, in light of the above, plaintiff is prohibited from taking the deposition of Harding Rome (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 10/17/2014. (ks)
December 1, 2014 158 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 57 Union Pacific's Motion for Summary Judgment (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 12/1/2014. (ks)
December 2, 2014 161 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 153 Union Pacific's Motion to Quash Plaintiff's Deposition Notice of Tracy Brown and Buck Russell and for Protective Order and quashing the notice to take the depositions of Tracy Brown and Buck Russell (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 12/2/2014. (ks)
December 10, 2014 171 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 109 Union Pacific's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Cartoon Animations and Accompanying Narrative (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 12/10/2014. (ks)
December 18, 2014 176 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 101 Union Pacific's Daubert Motion Regarding Plaintiff's Expert Charles Culver and striking any expert opinion testimony offered byCharles Culver (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 12/18/2014. (ks)
June 23, 2014 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 50 Union Pacific's Motion to Quash Plaintiff's Notice of Deposition and for Protective Order (as more fully set out in order). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 6/23/2014. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rayner v. Union Pacific Railroad Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: Robert D Hart
Represented By: Kevin S Hoskins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newfield Exploration Mid-Continent Inc
Represented By: Thomas A Paruolo
Represented By: Brett M Stingley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitzi Jayne Rayner
Represented By: David W Van Meter
Represented By: Charles J Watts
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]