United States of America v. $29,410.00 in US Currency

Defendant: $29,410.00 in US Currency
Claimant: Walter Kevin Moore, III
Plaintiff: United States of America
Case Number: 5:2013cv00132
Filed: February 5, 2013
Court: Oklahoma Western District Court
Office: Oklahoma City Office
County: Beckham
Presiding Judge: Timothy D. DeGiusti
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 4, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 Motion to Strike Claim of Walter Kevin Moore, III; denying 16 Motion to Strike. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 2/4/2014. (mb)
March 27, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Motion for Entry of Default; denying 20 Motion to Set Aside Default; striking 21 Response to Application for Default; striking 22 Motion to Dismiss; denying 24 Motion to Exclude; denying 25 Motion for Reconsideration; striking re 23 Brief filed by Walter Kevin Moore, III ; striking 26 Motion for Order; denying as moot 29 Motion to Strike ; denying as moot 30 Motion to Strike. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 3/27/2014. (mb)
April 21, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 33 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 4/21/2014. (mb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $29,410.00 in US Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $29,410.00 in US Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Walter Kevin Moore, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Robert Don Evans, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.