Blough v. Cooperative Benefit Administrators Inc et al

Defendant: National Rural Electric Cooperative Group Benefits Program, Rural Electric Coop Inc, National Rural Electric Cooperative Association, Dale Nye, Steve Newton, Cooperative Benefit Administrators Inc, Allsup Inc and Craig Kilmet
Plaintiff: Michael Blough
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv00191
Filed: February 22, 2013
 
Court: Oklahoma Western District Court
Office: Oklahoma City Office
County: Garvin
Presiding Judge: Timothy D. DeGiusti
 
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 22, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 10 Motion to Dismiss; granting 27 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 10/22/2013. (mb)
October 22, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 9 Motion to Strike Demand for Jury Trial. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 10/22/2013. (mb)
March 3, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 43 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 3/3/2014. (mb)
September 10, 2014 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 65 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 70 Motion to Stay Case. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 9/10/2014. (mb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Blough v. Cooperative Benefit Administrators Inc et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Rural Electric Cooperative Group Benefits Program
Represented By: Phillip G Whaley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rural Electric Coop Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Rural Electric Cooperative Association
Represented By: Phillip G Whaley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Nye
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Newton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooperative Benefit Administrators Inc
Represented By: Phillip G Whaley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allsup Inc
Represented By: Nathaniel T Haskins
Represented By: Elaine R Turner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Kilmet
Represented By: Phillip G Whaley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Blough
Represented By: Laurie J Miller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]