Fitzpatrick v. Monday et al

Respondent: William Monday and Attorney General of the State of Oklahoma
Petitioner: Keman Fitzpatrick
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv00284
Filed: March 22, 2013
 
Court: Oklahoma Western District Court
Office: Oklahoma City Office
County: Woodward
Referring Judge: Shon T. Erwin
Presiding Judge: Vicki Miles-LaGrange
 
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 31, 2013 10 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 9 and dismissing the petition for writ of habeas corpus as untimely. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 5/31/2013. (ks)
July 10, 2013 15 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 9 and dismissing the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus as untimely filed. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 7/10/2013. (ks)
April 19, 2013 8 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 5 , denying 2 petitioner's motion to proceed in forma pauperis, and recommitting this matter to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 4/19/2013. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Fitzpatrick v. Monday et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Monday
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Oklahoma
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Keman Fitzpatrick
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]