Williams et al v. CitiMortgage Inc et al

Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC, CitiMortgage Inc, Experian Information Solutions Inc and Trans Union LLC
Plaintiff: Jeri Williams and Michael Williams
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv00354
Filed: April 11, 2013
 
Court: Oklahoma Western District Court
Office: Oklahoma City Office
County: Pottawatomie
Presiding Judge: Vicki Miles-LaGrange
 
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 2, 2013 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 48 CitiMortgage's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint and dismisses plaintiffs' claim against CitiMortgage (as more fully set out in order). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 8/2/2013. (ks)
April 2, 2014 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 69 defendant CitiMortgage, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss as follows: (A) The Court grants the motion as to plaintiffs' request for statutory damages, punitive damages, and attorneys' fees under § 1681n(a), and (B) The Court denies the motion in all other respects (as more fully set out in order). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 4/2/2014. (ks)
April 2, 2014 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 72 defendants Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., and Trans Union LLC's Joint Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims of Willful Violations of the FCRA (as more fully set out in order). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 4/2/2014. (ks)
April 10, 2014 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 70 CitiMortgage's Alternative Motion to Strike the Class Allegations from Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint and 71 the CRA Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss or Strike Plaintiffs' Class Allegations and dismissing plaintiffs' claim for class certification (as more fully set out in order). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 4/10/2014. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Williams et al v. CitiMortgage Inc et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Represented By: Arthur F Hoge, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CitiMortgage Inc
Represented By: Brandee L Bruening
Represented By: Lysbeth L George
Represented By: Judy Hamilton Morse
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc
Represented By: Harris A Phillips, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: Juston R Givens
Represented By: Thomas G Wolfe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeri Williams
Represented By: Michael A Furlong
Represented By: Tony Gould
Represented By: Blake Sonne
Represented By: Joshua C Stockton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Williams
Represented By: Tony Gould
Represented By: Michael A Furlong
Represented By: Blake Sonne
Represented By: Joshua C Stockton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]