Racher et al v. Westlake Nursing Home Limited Partnership et al

Plaintiff: Doris Racher, Sandra Cisper and Earlene Adkisson
Defendant: Westlake Nursing Home Limited Partnership, Westlake Management Company, Ron Lusk, QC Property Holdings LLC and QC Nursing LLC
Case Number: 5:2013cv00364
Filed: April 15, 2013
Court: Oklahoma Western District Court
Office: Oklahoma City Office
County: Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Vicki Miles-LaGrange
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 29, 2015 141 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 96 defendant Ron Lusk's Motion for Summary Judgment (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 1/29/2015. (ks)
February 9, 2015 163 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding that because § 1-1939(A) is a special rule of respondeat superior, an employee must be acting within the scope of employment in order for the owner and licensee of a nursing home to be liable (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 2/9/2015. (ks)
August 2, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 26 Westlake Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss as follows: (A) The Court grants the partial motion to dismiss as to plaintiffs' Second Cause of Action for negligent hiring, training, supervisi on, and staffing and dismisses this cause of action, and (B) The Court denies the partial motion to dismiss as to plaintiffs' Sixth Cause of Action for intentional infliction of emotional distress (as more fully set out in order). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 8/2/2013. (ks)
August 2, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 24 Lusk's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Original Complaint as follows: (A) The Court grants the motion to dismiss as to plaintiffs' Sixth Cause of Action for intentional infliction of emotio nal distress and dismisses this cause of action only as to Lusk, and (B) The Court denies the motion to dismiss as to plaintiffs' Third Cause of Action for negligence, plaintiffs' Fourth Cause of Action for violation of the Nursing Home Care Act, and plaintiffs' Fifth Cause of Action for negligence per se (as more fully set out in the Order). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 8/2/2013. (ks)
May 14, 2014 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 54 Lusk's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Alter-Ego Liability Claim and dismissing plaintiffs' alter ego liability claim against Lusk (the Ninth Cause of Action in the Amended Complaint) (as more fully set out in order). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 5/14/2014. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Racher et al v. Westlake Nursing Home Limited Partnership et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doris Racher
Represented By: Kevin M Coffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Cisper
Represented By: Kevin M Coffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earlene Adkisson
Represented By: Kevin M Coffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westlake Nursing Home Limited Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westlake Management Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Lusk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QC Property Holdings LLC
Represented By: Don W Danz
Represented By: Michael D Goss
Represented By: W Michael Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QC Nursing LLC
Represented By: Don W Danz
Represented By: Michael D Goss
Represented By: W Michael Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]