Long et al v. LaSalle Bank National Association et al

Defendant: Cal-Western Reconveyance Corporation and LaSalle Bank National Association
Plaintiff: Toni L. Hothan and Elizabeth N. Long
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv01495
Filed: August 16, 2012
 
Court: Oregon District Court
Office: Medford (1) Office
Presiding Judge: Owen M. Panner
 
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 12, 2012 10 Featured Case Temporary Restraining Order, from this day until 9/20/12 5:00 p.m. Hearing on whether to issue a preliminary injunction set for 9/20/12 10:15 a.m. in Medford before Judge Panner. Ordered & Signed on 9/12/12 by Judge Owen M. Panner. (kf)
September 20, 2012 25 Featured Case Temporary Restraining Order, from this day until 10/1/12 5:00 p.m. Hearing on whether to issue a preliminary injunction set for 10/1/12 11:00 a.m. in Medford. Ordered & Signed on 9/20/12 by Judge Owen M. Panner. (kf)
August 29, 2012 6 Featured Case TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER: from this day until 9/12/12 at 5:00 p.m. Granting Motion 3 . Hearing on whether to issue a preliminary injunction set for 9/12/2012 at 11:00AM in Medford Courtroom before Judge Owen M. Panner. Ordered & Signed on 8/29/12 by Judge Owen M. Panner. (kf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Long et al v. LaSalle Bank National Association et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cal-Western Reconveyance Corporation
Represented By: Timothy B. Hering
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LaSalle Bank National Association
Represented By: Kristen L. Tranetzki
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toni L. Hothan
Represented By: Richard L. Billin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth N. Long
Represented By: Richard L. Billin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]