Kramer v. Southern Oregon University et al

Plaintiff: Ronald H. Kramer
Defendant: Oregon University System, George Pernsteiner, Southern Oregon University and Mary Cullinan
Case Number: 1:2013cv00340
Filed: February 27, 2013
Court: Oregon District Court
Office: Medford (1) Office
Presiding Judge: Mark D. Clarke
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 1, 2014 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Granting in Part Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 87 ); Granting in Part Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 91 ). (See attached PDF for complete details). Signed on 12/1/2014 by Judge Owen M. Panner. (jkm)
September 5, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Adopting the Report and Recommendation 25 ; Defendants' motions to dismiss Plaintiff's first and second claim are DENIED. Defendants' motion to dismiss Plaintiff's third claim is GRANTED. Plaintiff's third claim is DISMISSED without prejudice and with leave to file an amended complaint. Signed on 9/5/2013 by Judge Owen M. Panner. (dkj)
January 22, 2014 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Denying 39 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third and Fourth Claims for Relief. This matter is set for trial September 23, 2014. The Court will issue a more detailed trial management order following a Rule 16 Conference. Signed on 1/22/2014 by Judge Owen M. Panner. (dkj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kramer v. Southern Oregon University et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald H. Kramer
Represented By: Richard S Yugler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oregon University System
Represented By: Bruce A. Rubin
Represented By: Naomi L. Levelle-Haslitt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Pernsteiner
Represented By: Bruce A. Rubin
Represented By: Naomi L. Levelle-Haslitt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Oregon University
Represented By: Naomi L. Levelle-Haslitt
Represented By: Bruce A. Rubin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Cullinan
Represented By: Bruce A. Rubin
Represented By: Naomi L. Levelle-Haslitt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]