McGuire et al v. Clackamas County Counsel et al

Plaintiff: David R. McGuire, Arlene B. McGuire and Crystal Springs Assembly
Defendant: Clackamas County Counsel, Scott Ciecko, Ronald E. Cinniger, Kim Priest, Ken Spiegle, Clackamas County and State of Oregon
Case Number: 3:2008cv01098
Filed: September 19, 2008
Court: Oregon District Court
Office: Portland Office
County: Clackamas
Presiding Judge: John V. Acosta
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 27, 2009 48 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION - Mead's motion 27 for intervention should be DENIED. The Findings and Recommendation will be referred to a district judge for review. Objections, if any, are due September 11, 2009. If no objections are filed, then the Findings and Recommendation will go under advisement on that date. If objections are filed, then a response is due within 10 days after being served with a copy of the objections are filed. When the response is due or filed, whichever date is earlier, the Findings and Recommendation will go under advisement. Signed on 8/27/09 by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (peg)
September 30, 2009 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER The Court ADOPTS Magistrate Acosta's Findings and Recommendation 48 and, accordingly, DENIES Dorothy H. Mead's Motion to Intervene 27 Signed on 9/30/09, by United States District Judge Anna J. Brown. (peg)
October 26, 2009 59 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS & RECOMMENDATION by Judge Acosta - The County Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 31 should be GRANTED and the claims against them should be dismissed with prejudice. The Findings and Recommendation will be referred to a District Judge. Objections, if any, are due by 11/10/09. If objections are filed, a party may file a response to those objections within 10 days of being served with a copy of the objections. (peg)
November 24, 2009 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Adopting Magistrate Judge Acosta's Findings and Recommendation 56 and accordingly, GRANTS Judge Ronald E. Cinniger's Motion to Dismiss 22 with prejudice and DENIES Judge Cinniger's request for attorneys' fees. Signed on 11/24/09 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (cib)
November 24, 2009 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Adopts in part Magistrate Judge Acosta's Findings and Recommendation 59 and, accordingly, GRANTS Defendants' Motion 31 with prejudice as to Defendant Scott Ciecko. The Court, however, refers this matter back to the Magistrate Judge. Signed on 11/24/09 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (cib)
November 10, 2010 84 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION - Defendants' motion for summary judgment 70 should be GRANTED. Objections to the Findings and Recommendation are due by 11/24/2010. If objections are filed, a response to those objections may be filed within 14 days of being served a copy of the objections. When the response is due or filed, whichever date is earlier, the Findings and Recommendation will go under advisement. Dated this 10th day of November, 2010, by US Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (peg)
January 19, 2011 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court ADOPTS Magistrate Judge Acosta's Findings and Recommendation 84 and, GRANTS Defendants' Motion 70 for Summary Judgment. Signed on 01/19/2011 by Judge Anna J. Brown. See Order attached for full text. (bb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGuire et al v. Clackamas County Counsel et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David R. McGuire
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arlene B. McGuire
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Springs Assembly
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clackamas County Counsel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Ciecko
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald E. Cinniger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Priest
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Spiegle
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clackamas County
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Oregon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]