Obsidian Finance Group, LLC et al v. Cox

Defendant: Crystal Cox
Plaintiff: Obsidian Finance Group, LLC and Kevin D. Padrick
 
Case Number: 3:2011cv00057
Filed: January 14, 2011
 
Court: Oregon District Court
Office: Portland (3) Office
Presiding Judge: Marco A. Hernandez
 
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 23, 2012 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiffs' supplemental motion for fees and costs 98 is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiffs are awarded $4,911.57 as against defendant for defendant's failure to appear at her deposition. See 10-page order attached. Signed on 1/23/2012 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. Copy emailed to defendant Crystal Cox. (mr)
March 27, 2012 123 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION & ORDER: Defendant's motion for new trial 105 is denied. Signed on 3/27/2012 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. See 34-page opinion & order attached. Copy mailed to defendant Crystal Cox. (mr)
July 25, 2014 207 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION & ORDER: Defendant's motion for summary judgment 198 and motion for court trial/objection to jury trial 190 are denied. See 6-page opinion & order attached. Signed on 7/25/2014 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (mr)
July 7, 2011 26 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION & ORDER: Plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment 9 is denied. See 16-page opinion and order attached. Signed on 7/7/2011 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (mr)
August 23, 2011 31 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL OPINION & ORDER: Plaintiffs' July 22, 2011 Opposition Memorandum 27 is construed as a supplemental motion for summary judgment as to the blog posts not previously submitted with plaintiffs' original summary judgment m otion, and as so construed, is denied. Summary judgment independent of the motion pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 56(f), is granted to defendant as to all blog posts other than the December 25, 2010 blog post appearing on the "bankruptcycorruption.com" website. The Court will promptly set a telephone scheduling conference to establish a case schedule for trial. See 31-page opinion and order attached. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (mr)
October 18, 2011 44 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION & ORDER: Plaintiffs' motion to dismiss, or alternatively for summary judgment 36 , is granted and all of defendant's counterclaims are dismissed. See 8-page opinion & order attached. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. Copy of order mailed and emailed to defendant. (mr)
November 30, 2011 95 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION: Based on the evidence presented at the time of trial, I conclude that plaintiffs are not public figures, defendant is not "media," and the statements at issue were not made on an issue of public concern. Thus, there are no F irst Amendment implications. Defendant's other defenses of absolute privilege, Oregon's Shield Law, Oregon's Anti-SLAPP statute, and Oregon's retraction statutes, are not applicable. See 13-page opinion attached. Signed on 11/30/2011 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. Copy of opinion mailed and emailed to defendant. (mr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Obsidian Finance Group, LLC et al v. Cox
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Cox
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Obsidian Finance Group, LLC
Represented By: David S. Aman
Represented By: Steven M. Wilker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin D. Padrick
Represented By: David S. Aman
Represented By: Steven M. Wilker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]