California Bank & Trust v. Shilo Inn, Seaside East, LLC et al

Counter Defendant: California Bank & Trust
Plaintiff: California Bank & Trust
Counter Claimant: Mark S. Hemstreet and Shilo Inn, Seaside East, LLC
Defendant: Mark S. Hemstreet and Shilo Inn, Seaside East, LLC
Case Number: 3:2012cv00506
Filed: March 21, 2012
Court: Oregon District Court
Office: Portland (3) Office
Presiding Judge: Marco A. Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 17, 2014 119 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION & ORDER: Defendants' motion for leave to file supplemental counterclaims 103 is GRANTED. See 9-page opinion & order attached. Signed on 12/17/2014 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. Associated Cases: 3:12-cv-00506-HZ, 3:12-cv-00508-HZ, 3:12-cv-00509-HZ (mr)
March 6, 2015 140 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION & ORDER: The parties' requests for judicial notice 128 , 130 , 135 , and 138 , are GRANTED. CB&Ts motion for partial summary judgment on judicial foreclosure and summary judgment on Defendants' counterclaims 122 is GRANTED. Oral argument is not necessary. See 23-page opinion & order attached. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. Associated Cases: 3:12-cv-00506-HZ, 3:12-cv-00508-HZ, 3:12-cv-00509-HZ (mr)
November 15, 2012 84 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION & ORDER: Shilo Inn's Motions (doc. 57 , 57 , 62 ) are GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, and the court declines to address Plaintiff's request for judicial notice. Oral argument is unnecessary. See 13-page opinion & order attached. Signed on 11/15/2012 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. Associated Cases: 3:12-cv-00506-HZ, 3:12-cv-00508-HZ, 3:12-cv-00509-HZ (mr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: California Bank & Trust v. Shilo Inn, Seaside East, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: California Bank & Trust
Represented By: Eric D. Lansverk
Represented By: Amit D. Ranade
Represented By: Joseph A.G. Sakay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Bank & Trust
Represented By: Eric D. Lansverk
Represented By: Amit D. Ranade
Represented By: Joseph A.G. Sakay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Mark S. Hemstreet
Represented By: Charles R. Markley
Represented By: Kimberly Sugawa-Fujinaga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Shilo Inn, Seaside East, LLC
Represented By: Charles R. Markley
Represented By: Kimberly Sugawa-Fujinaga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark S. Hemstreet
Represented By: Charles R. Markley
Represented By: Kimberly Sugawa-Fujinaga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shilo Inn, Seaside East, LLC
Represented By: Charles R. Markley
Represented By: Kimberly Sugawa-Fujinaga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.