Yox v. Providence Health Plans

Counter Claimant: Providence Health Plans
Defendant: Providence Health Plans
Counter Defendant: Kelly J. Yox
Plaintiff: Kelly J. Yox
Case Number: 3:2012cv01348
Filed: July 25, 2012
Court: Oregon District Court
Office: Portland (3) Office
Presiding Judge: Marco A. Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 8, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION & ORDER: Defendant's motion for summary judgment 10 is denied. See 8-page opinion & order attached. Signed on 3/8/2013 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (mr)
December 31, 2013 66 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION & ORDER: Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment 44 is granted and Defendants' motion for judgment under Rule 52 40 is denied. See 20-page opinion & order attached. Signed on 12/31/2013 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (mr)
July 11, 2014 88 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION & ORDER: Plaintiff's motion for attorney's fees and costs 78 is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiff is awarded attorney's fees in the amount of $78,440 and costs in the amount of $414.76. See 13-page opinion & order attached. Signed on 7/11/2014 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (mr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yox v. Providence Health Plans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Providence Health Plans
Represented By: Aaron T. Bals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Providence Health Plans
Represented By: Aaron T. Bals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Kelly J. Yox
Represented By: Megan E. Glor
Represented By: John C. Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly J. Yox
Represented By: Megan E. Glor
Represented By: John C. Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.