Ouma v. Clackamas County et al

Defendant: John Does, 1-9, Rob Gordon, Craig Roberts, Washington County and Clackamas County
Plaintiff: Washie Ouma
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv01465
Filed: August 13, 2012
 
Court: Oregon District Court
Office: Portland (3) Office
Presiding Judge: Marco A. Hernandez
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 30, 2013 23 Featured Case OPINION & ORDER: Defendants' motions to dismiss ( 9 and 11 ) are GRANTED. Plaintiff may file a second amended complaint within three weeks of the date of this order. See 5-page opinion & order attached. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (mr)
September 3, 2013 33 Featured Case OPINION & ORDER: Defendant Clackamas County's motion to dismiss 25 is denied. See 3-page opinion & order attached. Signed on 9/3/2013 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (mr)
May 7, 2014 64 Featured Case OPINION & ORDER: Plaintiff has agreed to dismiss John Doe Defendants 4, 5, 6, 7, 8, and 9 and Plaintiff's third claim. Additionally, based on reasons previously stated, John Does 1, 2, and 3 are dismissed, Clackamas Countys motion 37 f or summary judgment is granted, and Washington County's motion for summary judgment 45 is granted. Therefore, Plaintiff's first and second claims are also dismissed. See 13-page opinion & order attached. Signed on 5/7/2014 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (mr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ouma v. Clackamas County et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does, 1-9
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob Gordon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Roberts
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington County
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clackamas County
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Washie Ouma
Represented By: Marianne G. Dugan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]