International Longshore and Warehouse Union, Local 40 v. Columbia Grain

Plaintiff: International Longshore and Warehouse Union, Local 40
Defendant: Columbia Grain
Case Number: 3:2013cv00513
Filed: March 26, 2013
Court: Oregon District Court
Office: Portland (3) Office
Presiding Judge: John V. Acosta
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185 Labor/Mgt. Relations (Contracts)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 7, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION - Columbia's Motion 8 to Dismiss should be DENIED. Local 40's request to amend the complaint to cure the deficiencies noted herein should be GRANTED. The Findings and Recommendation will be referred to a distric t judge for review. Objections, if any, are due in 15 days. If no objections are filed, then the Findings and Recommendations will go under advisement on that date. If objections are filed, then a response is due within 14 days after being served with a copy of the objections. When the response is due or filed, whichever date is earlier, the Findings and Recommendations will go under advisement. DATED this 7th day of October, 2013, by United States Magistrate Judge, John V. Acosta. (peg)
December 17, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - No party having made objections, this Court follows the recommendation of the Advisory Committee and reviews Judge Acosta's Findings and Recommendation for clear error on the face of the record. No such error is apparent. Accord ingly, the Court ADOPTS Judge Acosta's Findings and Recommendation 21 . Defendant Columbia Grain's motion to dismiss 8 is GRANTED without prejudice. Plaintiff Local 40's request to amend the complaint 15 is GRANTED. Signed on 12/17/2013 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
September 26, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION and ORDER - U.S. Magistrate Judge Acosta's Findings and Recommendation (Dkt. 41 ) is ADOPTED as explained herein. Defendant's motion for judgment on the pleadings and alternative motion for summary judgment (Dkt. 29 ) is DENIED. Signed on 9/26/2014 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Longshore and Warehouse Union, Local 40 v. Columbia Grain
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Longshore and Warehouse Union, Local 40
Represented By: Thomas K. Doyle
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Grain
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]