Skedco Inc. v. ARC Products, LLC

Plaintiff: Skedco Inc.
Defendant: ARC Products, LLC
Case Number: 3:2013cv00696
Filed: April 24, 2013
Court: Oregon District Court
Office: Portland (3) Office
Presiding Judge: Ancer L. Haggerty
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 30, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER: Defendant's Motion To Dismiss 7 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Defendant's motion as to a personal jurisdiction and venue is denied. Defendant's motion as to the laches doctrine is denied with leave to renew. Defendant's motion as to plaintiff's second claim is granted.(see 10 page opinion and order for further details) Signed on 7/30/13 by Judge Ancer L. Haggerty. (cib)
February 13, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss 25 signed on 2/13/2014 by Judge Ancer L. Haggerty. Defendant's counter claims are dismissed. The dismissal is without prejudice and defendant has leave to file an amended answer that addresses the deficiencies identified in this opinion within 21 days of this date. (sp)
June 2, 2014 63 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION and ORDER denying Plaintiff's Second Motion to Dismiss 34 signed on 6/2/2014 by Judge Ancer L. Haggerty. (sp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Skedco Inc. v. ARC Products, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Skedco Inc.
Represented By: Nathan C. Brunette
Represented By: Lois O. Rosenbaum
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARC Products, LLC
Represented By: Smith Freed & Eberhard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]