Alertas v. Social Security Administration

Defendant: Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Kathie J. Alertas
Case Number: 3:2013cv00717
Filed: April 29, 2013
Court: Oregon District Court
Office: Portland (3) Office
Presiding Judge: Michael H. Simon
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:416 Denial of Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 13, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion and Order - The Commissioner's decision that Ms. Alertas is not disabled is AFFIRMED as to Ms. Alertas's application for Disability Insurance Benefits, and REVERSED and remanded for an award of benefits as of April 18, 2012 as to Ms. Alertas's application for Supplemental Security Income benefits. Signed on 6/13/2014 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
August 8, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion and Order - The Commissioner's motion for to amend or correct the judgment pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 59(e) (Dkt. 32 ) is DENIED. Signed on 8/8/2014 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
November 12, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Granting Plaintiff's Application for Fees Pursuant to EAJA 39 . Signed on 11/12/2014 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alertas v. Social Security Administration
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Adrian L. Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathie J. Alertas
Represented By: Karen Stolzberg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]