Morgan v. JP Morgan Chase Bank et al

503) 222-7261 (fax: Thomas A. Ped
Defendant: Lender Processing Services, Inc., JP Morgan Chase Bank, Baxter & Baxter, Lyndon Ruhnke and Safeguard Properties, Inc.
206) 628-6611 (fax: Robert W. Sargeant
Plaintiff: Kristy Morgan
Case Number: 3:2013cv00842
Filed: May 18, 2013
Court: Oregon District Court
Office: Portland (3) Office
Presiding Judge: Anna J. Brown
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 10, 2013 51 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion and Order: The Court GRANTS the Motion 29 to Dismiss of Defendants Baxter & Baxter and Lyndon Ruhnke and DISMISSES Plaintiff's legal-malpractice claims without prejudice. Signed on 10/10/2013 by Judge Anna J. Brown. See attached 11 page Opinion and Order for full text. (bb)
October 22, 2013 54 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED Opinion and Order. Signed on 10/22/2013 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (bb)
January 23, 2014 62 Opinion or Order of the Court Stipulated Dismissal of Entire Action as to LPS Field Services. Signed on 01/23/2014 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (bb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morgan v. JP Morgan Chase Bank et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
503) 222-7261 (fax: Thomas A. Ped
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lender Processing Services, Inc.
Represented By: Garrett S. Garfield
Represented By: Louis A. Santiago
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baxter & Baxter
Represented By: Katie M. Eichner
Represented By: Paul Silver
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyndon Ruhnke
Represented By: Katie M. Eichner
Represented By: Paul Silver
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeguard Properties, Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn P. Salyer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
206) 628-6611 (fax: Robert W. Sargeant
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristy Morgan
Represented By: Sandy N. Webb
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]