Jacoby v. Commissioner Social Security Administration

Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Yvette U Jacoby
Case Number: 3:2013cv01526
Filed: August 29, 2013
Court: Oregon District Court
Office: Portland (3) Office
Presiding Judge: James A. Redden
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 5, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion and Order. The decision of the Commissioner is REVERSED and this matter is REMANDED pursuant to Sentence Four, 42 USC 405(g). Signed on 12/5/2014 by Judge James A. Redden. (sm)
March 9, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Based upon the Stipulation of the parties, it is hereby ORDERED that attorney fees in the amount of $7,603.50 are hereby awarded to Plaintiff, pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act (EAJA), 28 U.S.C. § 2412. See Order for details. Signed on 3/9/2015 by Magistrate Judge John Jelderks. (jtj)
March 19, 2015 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Granting Motion for Attorney Fees 26 . Attorneys' fees in the amount of $15,760.00 minus the EAJA fees of $7,603.50 previously paid for a total of $8,156.50 pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 406(b) are hereby awarded to Plaintiff's attorney. The court finds that this is a reasonable fee in light of the record in this case. When issuing the 406(b) check for payment to Plaintiffs attorneys, the Commissioner is directed to subtract any applicable processing fees as allowed by statute. Motion for Attorney Fees 25 is moot per filing of Amended Motion 26 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge John Jelderks. (jtj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacoby v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Represented By: Adrian L. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvette U Jacoby
Represented By: Richard F. McGinty
Represented By: Karl E. Osterhout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]