United States of America v. Lund et al

Defendant: Robert A. Lund and Colleen L. Lund
Plaintiff: United States of America
Case Number: 6:2012cv00062
Filed: January 12, 2012
Court: Oregon District Court
Office: Eugene Office
Presiding Judge: Thomas M. Coffin
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401 IRS: Tax Liability
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 1, 2012 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Adopting Findings and Recommendation 31 ; Denying Motion for Extension of Time 15 ; Denying Motion to Dismiss 16 . Robert Lund is ordered to file a response to the complaint within 11 days of the date of this order. Signed on 8/1/2012 by U.S. District Judge Michael R. Hogan. (plb)
August 31, 2012 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: denying Motions to Take Judicial Notice 40 , 41 , 42 and 43 ; granting Motion to Set Aside Default 39 ; granting Motion for Relief From Requirements to Confer 26 .FINDINGS & RECOMMENDATION: Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 34 should be denied. Objections to the Findings and Recommendation are due by 9/17/2012. Signed on 8/31/2012 by Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Coffin. (plb)
October 3, 2012 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Adopting Findings and Recommendation 52 . Denying Motion to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction 34 ; Signed on 10/3/12 by U.S. District Judge Michael R. Hogan. (sln)
April 1, 2013 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Adopting Judge Coffin's Findings and Recommendation 69 and Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment 59 . Signed on 4/1/2013 by Chief Judge Ann L. Aiken. (lg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Lund et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert A. Lund
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colleen L. Lund
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: S. Amanda Marshall
Represented By: Adam D. Strait
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]