Martinez v. Peters et al

Defendant: Steve Franke, Colette S. Peters, Jeff Premo, S.T. M. Lt. Ufford, S.T.M. Lt. Yancey and M. Yoder
Plaintiff: Leonel O. Martinez
Case Number: 6:2013cv00384
Filed: March 6, 2013
Court: Oregon District Court
Office: Eugene (6) Office
Presiding Judge: Paul Papak
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 1, 2014 111 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION & ORDER: Martinez shall have until 9/2/2014, to file a response to the moving defendants' constructive motion 91 , the moving defendants shall have until 9/16/2014, to file an optional reply in support of their constructive m otion 91 , and Martinez' motion 55 for partial summary judgment (styled as a motion for summary judgment) and the moving defendants' cross-motion 72 for partial summary judgment (styled as a motion for summary judgment) are Stricken from the Under Advisement Calendar of 6/17/2014, and will likewise be taken under advisement as of 9/17/2014. Signed on 7/1/14 by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (gm)
April 8, 2015 134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court ADOPTS Magistrate Judge Papak's Findings and Recommendation 131 . Accordingly, the Court DENIES Plaintiffs Motion 55 for Summary Judgment, GRANTS Defendants' Motion 72 for Summary Judgment, GRANTS Defendants& #039; Motion 91 to Dismiss, DISMISSES with prejudice Plaintiffs § 1983 claim set forth in his original Complaint 2 , and DISMISSES withoutprejudice Plaintiffs § 1983 claim set forth in his Supplemental Complaint 82 . Signed on 04/08/2015 by Judge Anna J. Brown. See attached 3 page Order for full text. (bb)
October 7, 2013 58 Opinion or Order of the Court Order. The Court AFFIRMS Magistrate Judge Papak's Order 9 denying Plaintiff's Motion 3 for Class Certification. Signed on 10/07/2013 by Judge Anna J. Brown.See attached 4 page Order for full text. (bb)
November 18, 2013 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction 52 is DENIED. Signed on 11/18/2013 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (gw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. Peters et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Franke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colette S. Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Premo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S.T. M. Lt. Ufford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S.T.M. Lt. Yancey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Yoder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonel O. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.