LEWIS et al v. LYCOMING et al

Defendant: AVCO CORPORATION, TEXTRON, INC., TEXTRON SYSTEMS CORPORATION, PRECISION AIRMOTIVE LLC, PRECISION AIRMOTIVE CORPORATION, SCHWEIZER AIRCRAFT CORPORATION, SCHWEIZER HOLDINGS, INC., SIKORSKY AIRCRAFT CORPORATION, UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION, CHAMPION AEROSPACE LLC and LYCOMING
Plaintiff: PAMELA LEWIS, KEITH WHITEHEAD and JOHN JOSEPH WROBLEWSKI
Case Number: 2:2011cv06475
Filed: October 17, 2011
Court: Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Outside the U.S.
Presiding Judge: HARVEY BARTLE
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 10, 2013 125 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 1/10/13. 1/10/13 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
January 10, 2013 126 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT JOINT MOTION OF DEFTS AVCO CORP., LYCOMING ENGINES, TEXTRON SYSTEMS CORP., TEXTRON, INC., PRECISION AIRMOTIVE LLC, PRECISION AIRMOTIVE CORP., SCHWEIZER AIRCRAFT CORP., SCHWEIZER HOLDINGS, INC., SIKORSKY AIRCRAFT CORP., UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP., & CHAMPION AEROSPACE LLC TO DISMISS THIS ACTION ON THE GROUND OF FORUM NON CONVENIENS IS DENIED AS TO ALL DEFTS EXCEPT PRECISION AIRMOTIVE LLC & PRECISION AIRMOTIVE CORP.; & MOTION OF DEFTS PRECISION AIRMOTIVE LLC & PRECISION AIRMOTIVE CORP. TO DISMISS THIS ACTION ON THE GROUND OF FORUM NON CONVENIENS IS HELD IN ABEYANCE BASED ON THE AUTOMATIC STAY.SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 1/10/13. 1/10/13 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
May 1, 2013 154 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION.SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 5/1/13.5/2/13 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
May 1, 2013 155 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT MOTION OF PLFFS FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF PRECISION AIRMOTIVE CORPORATION & PRECISION AIRMOTIVE LLC IS GRANTED; & PLFFS' CLAIMS AGAINST PRECISION AIRMOTIVE CORPORATION & PRECISION AIRMOTIVE LLC ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 5/1/13.5/2/13 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
July 17, 2013 163 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 7/17/13. 7/18/13 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
July 17, 2013 164 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT MOTION OF DEFTS SCHWEIZER AIRCRAFT CORP., SCHWEIZER HOLDINGS, INC., SIKORSKY AIRCRAFT CORP. & UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP. FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS (INCORRECTLY DENOMINATED A MOTION TO DISMISS) (DOC. #156) IS DENIED.SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 7/17/13. 7/18/13 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
May 9, 2012 70 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 5/9/12. 5/9/12 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
May 9, 2012 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT MOTION OF PLFFS PAMELA LEWIS, KEITH WHITEHEAD & JOHN WROBLEWSKI TO COLLATERALLY ESTOP AVCO CORPORATION FROM RELITIGATING THE DETERMINATION OF PENNSYLVANIA AS ITS PRINCIPAL PLACE OF BUSINESS IS DENIED.SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 5/9/12. 5/9/12 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
June 27, 2012 79 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 6/27/12. 6/27/12 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
June 27, 2012 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT MOTION OF PLFFS PAMELA LEWIS, KEITH WHITEHEAD & JOHN WROBLEWSKI TO REMAND THIS ACTION TO THE PENNSYLVANIA COURT OF COMMON PLEAS, PHILADELPHIA COUNTY IS DENIED.SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 6/27/12. 6/27/12 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LEWIS et al v. LYCOMING et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AVCO CORPORATION
Represented By: JAMES E. ROBINSON
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEXTRON, INC.
Represented By: JAMES E. ROBINSON
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEXTRON SYSTEMS CORPORATION
Represented By: JAMES E. ROBINSON
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRECISION AIRMOTIVE LLC
Represented By: WILLIAM J. CONROY
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRECISION AIRMOTIVE CORPORATION
Represented By: WILLIAM J. CONROY
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCHWEIZER AIRCRAFT CORPORATION
Represented By: JAMES C. STROUD
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCHWEIZER HOLDINGS, INC.
Represented By: JAMES C. STROUD
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SIKORSKY AIRCRAFT CORPORATION
Represented By: JAMES C. STROUD
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION
Represented By: JAMES C. STROUD
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHAMPION AEROSPACE LLC
Represented By: RALPH V. PAGANO
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LYCOMING
Represented By: JAMES E. ROBINSON
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAMELA LEWIS
Represented By: DANIEL O. ROSE
Represented By: RICHARD E. GENTER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEITH WHITEHEAD
Represented By: DANIEL O. ROSE
Represented By: RICHARD E. GENTER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN JOSEPH WROBLEWSKI
Represented By: DANIEL O. ROSE
Represented By: RICHARD E. GENTER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]