AAMCO TRANSMISSIONS, INC. v. SINGH

Defendant: PAVAMVIR SINGH
Plaintiff: AAMCO TRANSMISSIONS, INC.
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv02209
Filed: April 24, 2012
 
Court: Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Philadelphia
Presiding Judge: ROBERT F. KELLY
 
Nature of Suit: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 1, 2012 18 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ROBERT F. KELLY ON 10/1/2012. 10/1/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE DEFENDANT AND E-MAILED.(sg, )
October 1, 2012 19 Featured Case ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION IS GRANTED. SINGH, HIS AGENTS, SERVANTS, EMPLOYEES AND THOSE PERSONS IN ACTIVE CONCERT OR PARTICIPATION WITH HIM ARE HEREBY ENJOINED FROM OPERATING A TRANSMISSION REPAIR BUSINESS AT 18012 BOTH ELL-EVERETT HWY., SUITE #4, BOTHELL, WA 98012, OR ANYWHERE ELSE WITHIN 10 MILES OF AN AAMCO REPAIR CENTER. IS IT FURTHER ORDERED THAT SINGH SHALL FILE WITH THE COURT AND SERVE ON AAMCO WITH 30 DAYS AFTER THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, A REPORT IN WRITING, U NDER OATH, SETTING FORTH IN DETAIL THE MEASURE UNDERTAKEN BY SINGH TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER. AMMCO SHALL FILE A BOND, OR ESCROW ACCOUNT WITH THE CLERK OF COURT IN THE AMOUNT OF $5,000; AND THIS ORDER SHALL REMAIN IN FULL FORCE AND EFFECT UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THIS COURT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ROBERT F. KELLY ON 10/1/2012. 10/1/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE DEFENDANT AND E-MAILED.(sg, )
November 16, 2012 26 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ROBERT F. KELLY ON 11/16/2012. 11/16/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE DEFENDANT AND E-MAILED.(sg, )
November 16, 2012 27 Featured Case ORDERED THAT DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND FOR RE-ARGUEMENT IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ROBERT F. KELLY ON 11/16/2012. 11/16/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE DEFENDANT AND E-MAILED.(sg, )
June 12, 2013 35 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ROBERT F. KELLY ON 6/12/2013. 6/13/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE DEFENDANT AND E-MAILED.(sg, )
June 12, 2013 36 Featured Case ORDERED THAT ATTORNEYS' FEES ARE AWARDED TO AAMCO IN THE AMOUNT OF $7500.00. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ROBERT F. KELLY ON 6/12/2013. 6/13/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE DEFENDANT AND E-MAILED.(sg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: AAMCO TRANSMISSIONS, INC. v. SINGH
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAVAMVIR SINGH
Represented By: CHARLES V. CURLEY
Represented By: KELLE A. KILGARRIFF
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AAMCO TRANSMISSIONS, INC.
Represented By: WILLIAM B. JAMESON
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]