OLDCASTLE PRECAST, INC. v. RIDGEWOOD, INC. et al

Plaintiff: OLDCASTLE PRECAST, INC.
Defendant: RIDGEWOOD, INC., GAMBONE DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, VPMC, LTD., JOSEPH R. GAMBONE, JR., MICHAEL A. GAMBONE, TODD A. DRATCH, AUDREY GAMBONE, GEORGE J. FALCONERO, SANDRA LEE GAMBONE and SHARON ANAPOSLKY
Case Number: 2:2012cv06270
Filed: November 6, 2012
Court: Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Philadelphia
Presiding Judge: ROBERT F. KELLY
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Torts to Land
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 13, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ROBERT F. KELLY ON 5/13/13. 5/13/13 ENTERED & E-MAILED. [fdc]
May 13, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT 9 IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART AS FOLLOWS: THE MOTION IS GRANTED AS TO DEFENDANTS' CLAIMS AGAINST MICHAEL GAMBONE FOR CONVERSION (COUNT IV ) AND CIVIL CONSPIRACY (COUNT V); THE MOTION IS DENIED AS TO DEFENDANTS' CLAIMS AGAINST MICHAEL GAMBONE FOR FRAUD (COUNT I), NEGLIGENT MISREPRESENTATION (COUNT II), TORTIOUS INTERFERENCE WITH A CONTRACTUAL RELATIONSHIP (COUNT III), QUANTUM MERUI T (COUNT VII), AND ALTER EGO/PARTICIPATION (COUNT VIII); THE MOTION IS GRANTED AS TO DEFENDANTS' CLAIMS AGAINST THE VPMC PRINCIPALS FOR FRAUD (COUNT I), NEGLIGENT MISREPRESENTATION (COUNT II), CONVERSION (COUNT IV), CIVIL CONSPIREACY (COUNT V), AND QUANTUM MERUIT (COUNT VII); THE MOTION IS DENIED AS TO DEFENDANTS' CLAIMS AGAINST THE VPMC PRINCIPALS FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT (COUNT VI), ALTER EGO (COUNT VIII), AND PROMISSORY ESTOPPEL (COUNT IX); AND THE MOTION IS GRANTED AS TO DEFENDANTS&# 039; CLAIM AGAINST VPMC, LTD. FOR QUANTUM MERUIT (COUNT VII). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT, WITHIN FOURTEEN (14) DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, DEFENDANTS SHALL SUPPLY OLDCASTLE WITH REQUESTED DISCOVERY REGARDING THE "OWNERSHIP STRUCTURE AND FI NANCIAL ORGANIZATION" OF RIDGEWOOD, GDC, GAC, AND VPMC, LTD. THAT HAS NOT ALREADY BEEN DISCLOSED IN DEFENDANTS' ANSWERS TO THIS COURT'S QUESTIONS CONCERNING THE ISSUE OF INDISPENSABLE PARTIES. WITHIN TEN (10) DAYS OF RECEIPT OF THIS DI SCOVERY, OLDCASTLE SHALL FILE WITH THIS COURT ANY SUPPLEMENTAL RELEVANT INFORMATION AND/OR ARGUMENT REGARDING THIS ISSUE WHICH WAS NOT INCLUDED IN ITS RESPONSES TO THIS COURT'S QUESTIONS. THEREAFTER, DEFENDANTS MAY RENEW THEIR MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO FRCP 12(b)(7) IF THEY SO CHOOSE.SIGNED BY HONORABLE ROBERT F. KELLY ON 5/13/13. 5/13/13 ENTERED & E-MAILED.[fdc]
July 26, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ROBERT F. KELLY ON 7/26/13. 7/26/13 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
July 26, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION (19) IS DENIED AS MOOT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT OLDCASTLE'S ALTER EGO AND PARTICIPATION CLAIMS (COUNT VIII OF THE AMENDED COMPLAINT) AGAINST BOTH THE VPMC PRINCIPALS AND MI CHAEL GAMBONE ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJDUICE; OLDCASTLE'S CROSS-MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION (20) IS DENIED AS UNTIMELY; OLDCASTLE'S REQUEST TO AMEND ITS AMENDED COMPLAINT TO INCLUDE A BREACH OF CONTRACT CLAIM AGAINST VPMC IS DENIED; AND DEFEND ANTS SHALL HAVE FOURTEEN (14) DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER TO RENEW THEIR MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO FRCP 12(b)(7) SOLELY ON THE ISSUE OF "INDISPENSABLE PARTIES", IF THEY SO CHOOSE. IF DEFENDANTS FILE SUCH A MOTION, OLDCASTLE SHALL HAVE TEN (10) DAYS TO FILE A RESPONSE AND INCLUDE ANY ARGUMENT CONCERNING THIS ISSUE THAT WAS NOT INCLUDED IN ITS SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF THAT WAS FILED ON 6/26/13. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ROBERT F. KELLY ON 7/26/13. 7/26/13 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
September 13, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ROBERT F. KELLY ON 9/13/13. 9/13/13 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
September 13, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS, VPMC, LTD., JOSEPH R. GAMBONE, AUDREY GAMBONE, GEORGE J. FALCONERO, SANDRA LEE GAMBONE, AND SHARON ANAPOSIKY'S (COLLECTIVELY, "DEFENDANTS"), RENEWED MOTION TO DISMISS (25) IS GRANTED IN PART AND DE NIED IN PART AS FOLLOWS: THE MOTION IS DENIED AS TO THE DISMISSAL OF THE ACTION; AND THE MOTION IS GRANTED AS TO DEFENDANTS' REQUEST THAT RIDGEWOOD, INC. ("RIDGEWOOD") AND GAMBONE DEVELOPMENT COMPANY ("GDC") BE DETERMINED TO BE "INDISPENSABLE" PARTIES UNDER RULE 19 OF THE FRCP. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT, WITHIN FOURTEEN (14) DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, OLDCASTLE SHALL FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT ADDING RIDGEWOOD AND GDC AS DEFENDANTS IN THIS ACTION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ROBERT F. KELLY ON 9/13/13. 9/13/13 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
March 4, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ROBERT F. KELLY ON 3/4/14. 3/4/14 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
March 4, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS, GAMBONE DEVELOPMENT COMPANY AND RIDGEWOOD, INC.'S ("DEFENDANTS"), "MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO ASSERT COUNTERCLAIMS" (#34) AGAINST PLAINTIFF, OLDCASTLE PRECAST, INC. ("OLDCASTLE") IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ROBERT F. KELLY ON 3/4/14. 3/4/14 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OLDCASTLE PRECAST, INC. v. RIDGEWOOD, INC. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OLDCASTLE PRECAST, INC.
Represented By: JONATHAN A. CASS
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RIDGEWOOD, INC.
Represented By: BRIAN RICHARD ELIAS
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GAMBONE DEVELOPMENT COMPANY
Represented By: BRIAN RICHARD ELIAS
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VPMC, LTD.
Represented By: BRIAN RICHARD ELIAS
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH R. GAMBONE, JR.
Represented By: BRIAN RICHARD ELIAS
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL A. GAMBONE
Represented By: BRIAN RICHARD ELIAS
Represented By: BRIAN RICHARD ELIAS
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TODD A. DRATCH
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUDREY GAMBONE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGE J. FALCONERO
Represented By: BRIAN RICHARD ELIAS
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANDRA LEE GAMBONE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHARON ANAPOSLKY
Represented By: BRIAN RICHARD ELIAS
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]