BRINKMAN v. GOOGLE, INC. Featured Case

Plaintiff: KRISTEN BRINKMAN
Defendant: GOOGLE, INC.
Case Number: 2:2012cv06699
Filed: November 30, 2012
Court: Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Philadelphia
Presiding Judge: ANITA B. BRODY
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 18:2511 Wiretapping
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 5, 2013 Original record transferred to the Northern District of CALIFORNIA via interdistrict transfer system. (eibo, )
April 5, 2013 22 Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order, THAT THE ACTIONS LISTED ON SCHEDULE A ARE TRANSFERRED TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA AND, WITH THE CONSENT OF THAT COURT, ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE LUCY H. KOH FOR COORDINATED OR CONSOLIDATED PRETRIAL PROCEEDINGS IN THAT DISTRICT. (sg, )
March 13, 2013 21 Copy Re: Documents (Notice of Presentation or Waiver of Oral Argumentfiled by Attorney William E. Hopkins, Jr., Certificate of Service) Filed before the JPML Regarding MDL 2430. (tjd)
March 13, 2013 20 Copy Re: Documents (Withdrawal of Respondent's Opposition to Motion to Transfer to the ND-CA Under 28 U.S.C. 1407) Filed before the JPML Regarding MDL 2430. (tjd)
March 8, 2013 19 Copy Re: Documents (Notice of Presentation or Waiver of Oral Argument, Certificate of Service filed by Attorney Thomas Rosenfeld) Filed Before the JPML regarding MDL 2430. (tjd)
March 8, 2013 18 Copy Re: Documents (Notice of Presentation or Waiver of Oral Argument, Certificate of Service filed by Attorney F. Jerome Tapley) Filed Before the JPML regarding MDL 2430. (tjd)
March 7, 2013 17 Copy Re: Documents (Notice of Presenatation or Waiver of Oral Argument filed by Attorney Jim Wyly, Certificate of Service) Filed Before the JPML Regarding MDL 2430. (tjd)
March 6, 2013 16 Copy Re: Documents (Notice of Presentation or Waiver of Oral Argument filed by Attorney Whitty Somvichian, Proof of Service) Filed Before the JPML regarding MDL 2430. (tjd)
February 6, 2013 15 Copy of Documents (Withdraw of Response to Google's Motion for Transfer to the ND-CA, Certificate of Service) Filed Before the JPML regarding MDL 2430. (tjd)
February 6, 2013 14 Copy of Documents (Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion for Transfer to the ND-CA, Proof of Service) Filed Before the JPML regarding MDL 2430. (tjd)
February 6, 2013 13 Copy of Documents (Notice of Appearance, Certificate of Service) Filed Before the JPML regarding MDL 2430. (tjd)
February 6, 2013 12 Copy of Documents (Interested Party Response of Keith Dunbar In Response of Motion for Transfer to the ND-CA, Certificate of Service) Filed Before the JPML regarding MDL 2430. (tjd)
February 6, 2013 11 Copy of Documents (Reply in Support of Motion for Transfer to the ND-CA, Certificate of Service) Filed Before the JPML regarding MDL 2430. (tjd)
February 6, 2013 10 Copy of Documents (Response in Opposition to Google's Motion For Transfer to the CA-N, Proof of Service) Filed Before the JPML regarding MDL 2430. (tjd)
February 4, 2013 9 Featured Case ORDER tht THE PARTIES JOINT MOTION FOR A STAY OF PROCEEDINGS PENDING RULING BY JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION IS GRANTED.... IT IS THEREFORE, ORDERED that ALL PROCEEDINGS, DEADLINES, AND DISCOVERY IN THE ABOVE-ENTITLED ACTION ARE HEREBY STAYED UNTIL THIRTY (30) DAYS AFTER THE PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION RULES ON THE CURRENTLY PENDING MOTION FOR COORDINATION OR CONSOLIDATION OF THIS AND OTHER ACTIONS CAPTIONED IN RE GOOGLE INC. GMAIL LITIGATION (MDL NO. 2430), OR UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THIS COURT. THIS STAY SHALL INCLUDE A CONTINUANCE OF GOOGLE'S DEADLINE TO FILE ITS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT, CURRENTLY DUE ON FEBRUARY 8, 2013..... SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 2/4/2013. 2/4/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF.(mo, )
January 22, 2013 8 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Ruling by Judical Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by GOOGLE, INC... (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(CAPONI, STEVEN)
January 22, 2013 7 Copy Re: Documents (Notice of Appearance by Whitty Somichian on behalf of Google, Inc., Corporate Disclosure Statement) Filed Before the JPML Re: MDL 2430. (tjd)
January 22, 2013 6 Copy Re: Documents (Notice of Appearance by Richard Golomb on behalf of Kristen Brinkman) Filed Before the JPML Re: MDL 2430. (tjd)
January 7, 2013 5 Copy Re: Documents (Motion For Transfer of Related Actions to the ND-CA Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, Memorandum, Schedule of Actions, Cert of Service) Filed Before the JPML Re: In Re: Gmail Litigation. (tjd)
December 21, 2012 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service by N/A re: served Summons and Complaint upon Defendant Google by Certified Mail on December 11, 2012 (MARKOWITZ, TAMMI)
December 3, 2012 3 NOTICE of Appearance by KENNETH J. GRUNFELD on behalf of KRISTEN BRINKMAN (GRUNFELD, KENNETH)
December 3, 2012 2 NOTICE of Appearance by TAMMI MARKOWITZ on behalf of KRISTEN BRINKMAN (MARKOWITZ, TAMMI)
November 30, 2012 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by KRISTEN BRINKMAN. (ks, )
November 30, 2012 Summons Issued as to GOOGLE, INC.. Forwarded To: Counsel on 12/3/12 (ks, )
November 30, 2012 1 COMPLAINT against GOOGLE, INC. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 073092.), filed by KRISTEN BRINKMAN.(ks, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BRINKMAN v. GOOGLE, INC.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KRISTEN BRINKMAN
Represented By: TAMMI MARKOWITZ
Represented By: KENNETH J. GRUNFELD
Represented By: RICHARD M. GOLOMB
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOOGLE, INC.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]