MCNEILL et al v. BOROUGH OF FOLCROFT et al

Defendant: ROBERT RUSKOWSKI, BOROUGH OF FOLCROFT and MICHAEL FIOCCO
Plaintiff: THOMAS L. TAYLOR, EILEEN M. TAYLOR, MELISSA MCNEILL and MARK G. MCNEILL
Case Number: 2:2013cv03592
Filed: June 24, 2013
Court: Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Delaware
Presiding Judge: HARVEY BARTLE
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 13, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 11/12/2014. 11/13/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jmg, )
November 12, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOC. NO. 15) IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. OTHER INSTRUCTIONS ARE AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 11/12/2014. 11/13/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jmg, )
December 15, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 12/12/2014. 12/15/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (ems)
December 15, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION ORDER THAT THE MOTION OF PLAINTIFFS FOR RECONSIDERATION (DOC. NO. 22) OF THE COURT'S ORDER GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS DENIED; AND THE MOTION OF PLAINTIFFS FOR A FINAL JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 54(b) OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 12/12/2014. 12/15/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (ems)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCNEILL et al v. BOROUGH OF FOLCROFT et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT RUSKOWSKI
Represented By: ROBERT P. DIDOMENICIS
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOROUGH OF FOLCROFT
Represented By: ROBERT P. DIDOMENICIS
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL FIOCCO
Represented By: ROBERT P. DIDOMENICIS
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS L. TAYLOR
Represented By: DANIEL A. ARMSTRONG
Represented By: JOHN E. KUSTURISS
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EILEEN M. TAYLOR
Represented By: JOHN E. KUSTURISS
Represented By: DANIEL A. ARMSTRONG
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELISSA MCNEILL
Represented By: JOHN E. KUSTURISS
Represented By: DANIEL A. ARMSTRONG
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK G. MCNEILL
Represented By: JOHN E. KUSTURISS
Represented By: DANIEL A. ARMSTRONG
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]