George v. Boise Cascade Corp/Office Max

Plaintiff: Ray A. George
Defendant: Boise Cascade Corp/Office Max
Case Number: 1:2008cv02113
Filed: November 21, 2008
Court: Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Office: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: Yvette Kane
Referring Judge: J. Andrew Smyser
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Racketeering (RICO) Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 14, 2009 15 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the 10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION is NOT ADOPTED. The Marshal is directed to serve the complaint on Dft Boise Cascade Corp./Office Max as provided in FRCP 4. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is referred back to MJ Smyser for further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Yvette Kane on October 14, 2009. (sc)
November 1, 2010 41 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion 23 for the appointment of counsel is DENIED. The defendants motion 30 for summary judgment is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in favor of the defendant and against the plaintiff and to mark this action CLOSED. The pretrial conference scheduled for December 16, 2010 is CANCELLED. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Andrew Smyser on 11/1/10. (rc)
December 6, 2010 50 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS ORDERED THAT plaintiff's motion for reconsideration and for leave to file an amended complaint (Docs. 43 , 45 , and 46 ) are denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Andrew Smyser on 12/6/10. (pw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: George v. Boise Cascade Corp/Office Max
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray A. George
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boise Cascade Corp/Office Max
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]