Sherwood v. Beard et al

Petitioner: Brentt M. Sherwood
Respondent: Jeffrey Beard, Louis S. Folino, Marirosa Lamas and PA State Attorney General
Case Number: 1:2010cv01073
Filed: May 19, 2010
Court: Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Office: Harrisburg Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: Christopher C. Conner
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 30, 2011 29 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1)Sherwood's motion 26 to stay the federal proceeding is DENIED; 2)Sherwood's petition for a writ of habeas corpus 22 is DISMISSED w/o prejudice to his right to seek timely habeas relief once he has exhausted his state court remedies; 3)Sherwood's motion to exceed page limitation 21 is DENIED as moot; 4)Issuance of a certificate of appealability is DENIED; and 5)The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE the case.Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 12/30/11. (dh)
September 12, 2012 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Magistrate Judge Carlson 40 & DENYING petitioner's motion to alter or amend the judgmeent 30 . (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 09/12/12. (ki)
August 18, 2010 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. Ptnr's motion for IFP status 2 is GRANTED.; 2. Ptnr's request for appt of cnsl 1 is GRANTED & Capital H/C Units of FPD for MDPA & Fed Comm Defender for EDPA appointed as fed h/c cnsl to rep ptnr in this proceeding...; It is further ORDERED that parties to comply w/ following schedule... (see Paras 1-9 for specific instructions), inc. - Ptnr to file petition for writ of h/c by 2/24/11. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 08/18/10. (ki)
August 30, 2010 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER modifying 8/18/10 order 7 to remove Fed Community Defender Office for EDPA Capital Habeas Unite & to appoint Enid W. Harris, Esquire, in their stead w/ Ms. Harris & Anne Saunders, Esq., of Fed Public Defender's Office of MDPA Capital Habeas Unit to represente petitioner. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 08/27/10. (ki)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sherwood v. Beard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Brentt M. Sherwood
Represented By: Enid W. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeffrey Beard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Louis S. Folino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Marirosa Lamas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: PA State Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.