United States of America v. Barges

Defendant: Kimberly D. Barges
Plaintiff: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2013cv00100
Filed: January 15, 2013
Court: Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Office: Harrisburg Office
County: Cumberland
Presiding Judge: Christopher C. Conner
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 3, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER & DEFAULT JUDGMENT granting pltf's motion for default jdgmt 8 , entering jdgmt in favor of pltf & against deft in amt of $157,256.39 plus interest @ rate of $18.12/day from 9/14/12 to date of USM or other sale of property, foreclosing promissory note & mortgage btwn pltf & deft as to property @ 111 Walleye Dr, Shippensburg, PA w/ no right of redemption, directing sale of property... (see Paras 3a-d for specific instructions), directing USM to hold proceeds of sale after costs & expenses upon confirmation of sale pending distribution per further order of court, noting pltf to be pd amt due pursuant to distribution of sale proceeds, directing Clrk of Ct to deliver true copy of this order to USM, & noting ct shall retain jurisdiction over matter. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 6/3/13. (ki)
March 31, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltf's motion for confirmation of public sale 14 - It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. Public sale held 2/19/14 confirmed & interest of all lien holders divested. ; 2. USM directed to execute & deliver to BP Group, LP.... good & suffi cient deed... to premises sold @ 111 Walleye Dr, Shippensburg, PA 17257.; 3. Deed shall be recorded by purchaser w/in 30 days of delivery by USM & purchaser solely responsible for pymt of all recording chgs & expenses.; 4. Jurisdiction retained... (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 3/31/14. (ki)
May 21, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting application for distribution of proceeds 16 from sale of real property @ 111 Walleye Dr., Shippensburg, PA 17257 & directing USM to distribute proceeds of sale in acc w/ sched of distribution (in Doc 16 ). (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 5/21/14. (ki)
March 28, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting plaintiff's motion for service by posting property & certified mail 4 . (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 3/28/13. (ki)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Barges
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly D. Barges
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Thomas I. Puleo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]