National Collegiate Athletic Association v. Corbett et al

Defendant: Mark R. Zimmer, Thomas W. Corbett, Jr., Rob McCord and Eugene Depasquale
Plaintiff: National Collegiate Athletic Association
Intervenor_defendant: Jake Corman
Case Number: 1:2013cv00457
Filed: February 20, 2013
Court: Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Office: Harrisburg Office
County: Dauphin
Presiding Judge: Yvette Kane
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 15, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry).Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on Oct. 15, 2013. (sc)
October 15, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Senator Jake Corman's Motion to Intervene is DENIED. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 10/15/13. (sc)
June 12, 2014 45 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re 19 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Eugene Depasquale, 18 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Rob McCord, and 17 MOTION to Dismiss Abstain or, in the alternative, for Abstention/Stay filed by Thomas W. Corbett, Jr., Mark R. Zimmer. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 6/12/14. (pw)
January 13, 2015 84 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry).Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 1/13/15. (aaa)
January 13, 2015 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry).It is HEREBY ORDERED THAT:1) The parties' joint motion to take judicial notice 44 is GRANTED;2) Plaintiff's motion for judgment on the pleadings pursuant to FR Civ. Proc. 12(c) 58 is DENIED AS MOOT;3) Plaintiff's motion to expedite hearing and consideration of Plaintiff's motion for judgment on the pleadings 60 is DENIED AS MOOT;4) Defendant's cross motion for judgment on the pleadings 74 is GRANTED; and 5) The Clerk of Court is directed to close the above-captioned case.Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 1/13/15. (aaa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Collegiate Athletic Association v. Corbett et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark R. Zimmer
Represented By: Linda Cadden Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas W. Corbett, Jr.
Represented By: Linda Cadden Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob McCord
Represented By: Christopher B. Craig
Represented By: Craig S. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugene Depasquale
Represented By: Kathryn Boockvar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Collegiate Athletic Association
Represented By: James Scott Ballenger
Represented By: Everett C. Johnson
Represented By: Thomas W. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Jake Corman
Represented By: Matthew H. Haverstick
Represented By: Mark E. Seiberling
Represented By: Joshua John Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]