Sepulveda et al v. United States Of America

Defendant: United States Of America
Plaintiff: Shaun Tellado, James Davenport and George Sepulveda
Mediator: Mediator
Case Number: 1:2013cv01262
Filed: May 9, 2013
Court: Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Office: Harrisburg Office
County: Wayne
Referring Judge: Martin C. Carlson
Presiding Judge: Sylvia H. Rambo
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 4, 2014 64 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM & ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the Defendants Motion 59 for Protective Order is GRANTED and Discovery is STAYED pending resolution of theMotion to Dismiss filed in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on 4/4/14. (rc)
April 9, 2014 66 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry).Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on 4/9/14. (rc)
April 9, 2014 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry)-IT IS ORDERED that the Defendants Motion 54 to Dismiss is GRANTED and the Plaintiffs Complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice to the re-filing of this Complaint now that the Plaintiff ha s fully exhausted his administrative tort claim, provided that the Plaintiff acts within 20 days of this dismissal order.to Dismiss is GRANTED and the Plaintiffs Complaint is DISMISSEDwithout prejudice to the re-filing of this Complaint now that the Plaintiff has fully exhausted his administrative tort claim, provided that the Plaintiff acts within 20 days of this dismissal order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on 4/9/14. (rc) Modified on 4/9/2014 (rc).
April 30, 2014 70 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM re 68 MOTION for Reconsideration re 67 Order (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) filed by United States Of America. The Deefendant's Motion to Reconsider the order granting the defendant's motion to dismiss ic DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on 4/30/14. (pw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sepulveda et al v. United States Of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Of America
Represented By: Justin Blewitt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaun Tellado
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Davenport
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Sepulveda
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Mediator: Mediator
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Barrett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]