Lester, et al v. Percudani, et al

Plaintiff: Eddie Lester, Sharon Lester, Gilbert Vazquez, Madeline Vazquez, Arthur Lucky, Angela Romano-Lucky and All Plaintiffs
Defendant: Gene P. Percudani, Chase Manhattan Mortgage Corporation, Chapel Creek Homes, Inc., Raintree Homes, Inc., Chapel Creek Mortgage Banker, Inc., Dominick P. Stranieri and William Spaner
Cross_claimant: Chase Manhattan Mortgage Corporation, William Spaner, Dominick P. Stranieri, Chapel Creek Homes, Inc., Chapel Creek Mortgage Banker, Inc., Gene P. Percudani and Raintree Homes, Inc.
Cross_defendant: Chapel Creek Homes, Inc., Chapel Creek Mortgage Banker, Inc., Gene P. Percudani, Raintree Homes, Inc., Dominick P. Stranieri, Chase Manhattan Mortgage Corporation, William Spaner, John Doe Abstract Company, John Doe Title Company and John Doe Mortgage Broker
Case Number: 3:2001cv01182
Filed: June 28, 2001
Court: Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Office: Scranton Office
County: Monroe
Presiding Judge: Christopher C. Conner
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 1, 2008 412 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying pltfs' motion for reconsideration 319 fo dismissal of negligent misrepresentation claim. (See memo & order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 02/01/08. (ki)
September 22, 2008 451 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying motion for reconsideration and to amend 413 & noting that revised pretrial/trial schedule to issue upon resolution of unrelated motion for reconsideration. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 09/22/08. (ki)
October 24, 2008 452 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1) The motion for reconsideration (Civil Action No. 3:01-CV-1182, Doc. 422; Civil Action No. 1:04-CV-0832, Doc. 285) is denied. 2) A revised pretrial and trial schedule shall issue under separate order of court. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 10/24/08. (jc)
June 28, 2010 499 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting motion to seal 495 docs 498 , 496 & 497 . (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 06/28/10. (ki)
December 8, 2011 525 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. Pltf's motion 515 (383 in 1:04-CV-0832) to enforce settlement agreement is GRANTED.; Defts cross motion 517 (385 in 1:04-CV-0832) to enforce settlement agreement is DENIED.; 3. W/in 14 day s of the date of this order defts shall tender $300,000 to pltfs' cnsl in acc w/ terms of parties' settlement agreement.; 4. W/in 14 days of date of this order pltfs shall file letter w/ ct informing ct whether there are any outstanding matters, or whether matter may be closed. (See memo & order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 12/08/11. (ki)
February 21, 2012 534 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting motion for stay pending appeal 528 , staying Para 3 of ct's order 393 of 12/8/11 directing defts to tender $300K to pltfs' cnsl in acc w/ terms of parties's settlement agreement, & directing Clrk of Ct to invest $301,750 posted as bond into interest-bearing acct consistent w/ mandates of FRCP 67 & LR 67.1 as soon as practicable... (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 02/21/12. (ki)
October 11, 2013 554 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re: cross-motions to enforce settlement agreement 515 & 517 & judgment & mandate of 3rd Cir USCA 537 & 538 . (See memo for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 10/11/13. (ki)
October 11, 2013 555 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) re: Memo 554 - It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. Prior to final enforcement of parties' settlement agmt, pltfs must provide defts the following settlement documentation - A. Bankruptcy o rders from bankruptcy cases of Odell & Stacy Harrison, Robert & Sylvia Johnson, & Richard & Mary Negron.; B. New releases from Pedro & Olga Caban, Carol Thompson & Bernice Williams. (See order for complete details.)Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 10/11/13. (ki)
November 27, 2013 572 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying defts' motion for for attorneys' fees & sanctions 560 . (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 11/27/13.(ki)
December 5, 2013 573 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re: motion to releae supersedeas bond 557 . (See memo for complete details.)Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 12/05/13. (ki)
December 5, 2013 574 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (memorandum 573 filed previously as separate docket entry) - It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. Defts' motion 557 for release of supersedeas bond GRANTED in part & DENIED in part.; 2. Clrk of Ct directed to release supersedeas bond & distr ibute the funds posted for the bond & any interest thereon to cnsl for defts, Marshall Anders, Esq.; 3. Atty Anders shall hold funds in escrow until further order of ct or joint filing of stip of dismissal. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 12/5/13. (ki)
March 20, 2014 599 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: ct's prior order 596 re: pro se pltf Dwayne Thompson - It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. Thompson's claim in Case No. 1:04-CV-0832 is EXTINGUISHED with prejudice for failure to prosecute.; 2. Defts' motion 580 to correct c t's order 555 req'ng pltfs to provide settlement documentation, wherein defts reqeust ct to amend its order to require pltfs' cnsl to provide a release for pltf Dwayne Thompson is DENIED as MOOT. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 3/20/14. (ki)
May 28, 2014 602 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING pltfs' motion to enforce settlement agreement 515 (& Case No. 1:04-CV-0832, Doc. 383), directing cnsl for defts Atty Anders w/in 14 days of date of this order to transfer settlement funds from his escrow acct to pltfs' cns l in acc w/ terms of parties' settlement agreement & prior orders of ct, & directing pltfs w/in 14 days of this order to file letter w/ ct informing ct whether there are any oustanding matters or whether above-captioned matter may be closed. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 5/28/14. (ki)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lester, et al v. Percudani, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Lester
Represented By: David B. Banks
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Lester
Represented By: David B. Banks
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilbert Vazquez
Represented By: David B. Banks
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madeline Vazquez
Represented By: David B. Banks
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Lucky
Represented By: David B. Banks
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Romano-Lucky
Represented By: David B. Banks
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: All Plaintiffs
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gene P. Percudani
Represented By: Marshall E Anders
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Manhattan Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Daniel T. Brier
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chapel Creek Homes, Inc.
Represented By: Marshall E Anders
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raintree Homes, Inc.
Represented By: Marshall E Anders
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chapel Creek Mortgage Banker, Inc.
Represented By: Marshall E Anders
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominick P. Stranieri
Represented By: Lee Applebaum
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Spaner
Represented By: Daniel T. Brier
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Chase Manhattan Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Daniel T. Brier
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: William Spaner
Represented By: Daniel T. Brier
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Dominick P. Stranieri
Represented By: Lee Applebaum
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Chapel Creek Homes, Inc.
Represented By: Marshall E Anders
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Chapel Creek Mortgage Banker, Inc.
Represented By: Marshall E Anders
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Gene P. Percudani
Represented By: Marshall E Anders
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Raintree Homes, Inc.
Represented By: Marshall E Anders
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Chapel Creek Homes, Inc.
Represented By: Marshall E Anders
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Chapel Creek Mortgage Banker, Inc.
Represented By: Marshall E Anders
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Gene P. Percudani
Represented By: Marshall E Anders
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Raintree Homes, Inc.
Represented By: Marshall E Anders
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Dominick P. Stranieri
Represented By: Lee Applebaum
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Chase Manhattan Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Daniel T. Brier
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: William Spaner
Represented By: Daniel T. Brier
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: John Doe Abstract Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: John Doe Title Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: John Doe Mortgage Broker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]