Smith v. Wilson

Defendant: Nick Wilson
Plaintiff: I-Kiem Smith
Case Number: 3:2013cv00771
Filed: March 26, 2013
Court: Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Office: Scranton Office
County: Huntingdon
Referring Judge: Martin C. Carlson
Presiding Judge: Edwin M. Kosik
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 20, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 20 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by I-Kiem Smith. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on December 20, 2013. (kjn)
September 15, 2014 58 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry)Signed by Honorable Edwin M. Kosik on 9/15/14. (ga)
September 15, 2014 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry). The Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson dated June 26, 2014 (Doc. 52), is adopted in part and declined in part. Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment (Do c. 27) is DENIED. Defendant's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 32) is DENIED. Pretrial statement shall be filed within 30 days in accordance with attached Appendix A, after which we will determine if a pretrial conference is necessary.Signed by Honorable Edwin M. Kosik on 9/15/14. (ga)
October 6, 2014 68 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry).Signed by Honorable Edwin M. Kosik on 10/6/2014. (bg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Wilson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick Wilson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I-Kiem Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]