Corbin v. Bickell et al

Defendant: Scott Walters, T Hicks-Kern, Mary Lou Showalter, Meg Yost, Tabb Bickell, Connie Green, Kurt Granlund, Dorina Varner, SCI-Huntingdon and PA. Dept. of Corrections
Plaintiff: Anthony Corbin
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00856
Filed: April 5, 2013
 
Court: Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Office: Scranton Office
County: Huntingdon
Presiding Judge: Edwin M. Kosik
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 9, 2013 16 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Defendants Showalter, Yost, Walters and Hicks-Kern are DISMISSED from this action with prejudice. Plaintiff's Eighth Amendment claim is allowed to PROCEED only as against defendants Granlund and Bickell. The above-captioned action is REMANDED to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings.Signed by Honorable Edwin M. Kosik on 13-856. (ga)
July 21, 2014 47 Featured Case MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry)Signed by Honorable Edwin M. Kosik on 7/20/14. (ga)
July 21, 2014 48 Featured Case ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry). We adopt the Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Blewitt dated February 28, 2014 (Doc. 40), for the reasons stated in the Memorandum. Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 31) is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel (Doc. 45) is DENIED. Judgment is hereby entered in favor of the remaining Defendants and against the Plaintiff. The Clerk of Court is further directed to CLOSE this case and to FORWARD a copy of the Memorandum and Order to the Magistrate Judge.Signed by Honorable Edwin M. Kosik on 7/21/14. (ga)
May 9, 2013 9 Featured Case ORDER - 1. adopting in part Report and Recommendations re 6 Report and Recommendations. 2. Plaintiffs Objections to Report and Recommendation and his addendum to the Objections Doc 7, 8 are OVERRULED, in part, and SUSTAINED, in part; 3. Plaint iff's claims for monetary damages against Defendants in their official capacities are DISMISSED, with prejudice; 4. Plaintiff's requests for relief in the form of transfer are DISMISSED, with prejudice, from this action; 6. Plaintiff 9;s claims against all Defendants in their official capacities are DISMISSED, with prejudice; 7. The claims against Defendant Bickell, Showalter, Yost, Wlaters, Hicks-Kern, and Granlund, in their personal capacities, will be allowed to proceed; 8. The Plaintiff has thirty (30) days from the date of this Order in which to amend his Complaint in accordance with the accompanying Memorandum; and 9. The above-captioned case is REMANDED to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings consistent with this Memorandum and Order. Signed by Honorable Edwin M. Kosik on 5/9/2013 (cw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Corbin v. Bickell et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Walters
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Hicks-Kern
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Lou Showalter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meg Yost
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tabb Bickell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Green
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kurt Granlund
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorina Varner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCI-Huntingdon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PA. Dept. of Corrections
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Corbin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]