United States Of America v. Bogart et al

Plaintiff: United States Of America
Defendant: Dustin B. Bogart, Marcy A. Bogart and Southern Country Ranch
Case Number: 4:2012cv00347
Filed: February 22, 2012
Court: Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Office: Williamsport Office
County: Northumberland
Presiding Judge: Christopher C. Conner
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 22, 2012 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. Pltf shall respond to 2nd MTD 11 in acc w/ both FRCP & MDPA Local Rules.; 2. Motion to dismiss 6 DENIED as MOOT w/out prejudice. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 08/22/12. (ki)
August 30, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. Dustin Bogart's motion for ext of time 15 to fine cnsl is GRANTED - has 60 days to notify ct if he wishes to file amended motion to dismiss or stand on the one currently before the ct.; 2. Briefing ddls on current MTD 11 & motion to strike 12 STAYED pending Dustin Bogarts notification to the ct.; 3. To extent Dustin Bogard is making request for cnsl on behalf of either Marcy Bogart or Southern Country Ranch the motion is DENIED. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 08/30/12. (ki)
October 12, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying deft Dustin Bogart's motion to strike 13 . (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 10/12/12. (ki)
December 5, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying the Bogarts' motion for reconsideration 22 & granting Bogarts' request for addt'l 30 days to obtain cnsl. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 12/05/12. (ki)
July 16, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: DENYING dft Bogart's motion to continue and supplement for reconsideration 25 ; dft shall notify the Court, in writing, within 14 days of this Order of whether he intends to file an amended motion to dismiss or proceed w/ the motion to dismiss presently before the Court; if dft fails to notify the Court w/in 14 days, the Court will presume he intends to proceed on the current motion to dismiss and plaintiff will have an additional 14 days in which to file an opposition to the motion. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 7/16/13. (km)
August 14, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Bogart Defendants have 14 days from the entry of this Order in which to file an amended motion to dismiss. If they fail to file such a motion, the Court will proceed on their original Motion to Dismiss 11 . Plaintiff will have 14 days from the date of service of Defendants' amended motion in which to file an opposition to the same. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 8/14/2014. (km)
November 5, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re 39 MOTION to Dismiss filed by defendants. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/5/13. (km)
November 5, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry): In accordance with the Court's Memorandum, filed this same date [ECF No. 43] - Defendants Dustin B. Bogart, Marcy A. Bogart, and Southern Country Ranch's 39 MOTION to Dismiss is DENIED. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/5/13. (km)
July 9, 2014 68 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry)Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 7/9/14. (km)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Of America v. Bogart et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Of America
Represented By: E. Christopher Lambert
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin B. Bogart
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcy A. Bogart
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Country Ranch
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]